blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0391607

EP0391607 - Molecular sieve-type gas separation systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.1995 [1995/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORMALAIR-GARRETT (HOLDINGS) LIMITED
Box 206, Westland Works Yeovil
Somerset, BA20 2YB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]For all designated states
NORMALAIR-GARRETT (HOLDINGS) LIMITED
Box 206, Westland Works
Yeovil Somerset, BA20 2YB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hamlin, Humphrey Albert Samuel
27 Bishopston
Montacute, Yeovil, Somerset / GB
02 / Harral, Michael William
181 Monks Dale
Yeovil, Somerset / GB
[1990/41]
Representative(s)Jack, Bruce J., et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]Jack, Bruce James, et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date90303377.729.03.1990
[1990/41]
Priority number, dateGB1989000744703.04.1989         Original published format: GB 8907447
[1990/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0391607
Date:10.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0391607
Date:06.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0391607
Date:07.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1991
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/04
[1990/41]
CPC:
B64D13/00 (EP,US); B01D46/44 (KR); A62B7/14 (EP,US);
B01D53/0454 (EP,US); B64D2013/0681 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1990/41]
TitleGerman:Molekularsiebgastrennungssysteme[1990/41]
English:Molecular sieve-type gas separation systems[1990/41]
French:Systèmes de séparation de gaz du type tamis moléculaire[1990/41]
Examination procedure07.08.1991Examination requested  [1991/40]
24.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.1994Fee for grant paid
13.04.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2029257  (LINDE AG);
 [AD]EP0129304  (NORMALAIR GARRETT LTD [GB]);
 [A]US4516424  (ROWLAND ROBERT O [US]);
 [A]US4594080  (TREMAIN J KEITH [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.