Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0399666

EP0399666 - Fusion proteins containing N-terminal fragments of human serum albumin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.1994
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.1994 [1994/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delta Biotechnology Limited
Castle Court, Castle Boulevard
Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB
[1990/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Ballance, David James
11 South Road
West Bridgford, Nottingham NG2 7AG / GB
[1990/48]
Representative(s)Bassett, Richard Simon , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/48]Bassett, Richard Simon , et al
ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date90304575.526.04.1990
[1990/48]
Priority number, dateGB1989000991929.04.1989         Original published format: GB 8909919
[1990/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0399666
Date:28.11.1990
Language:EN
[1990/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0399666
Date:28.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1990
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/62, C07K13/00, C12P21/02
[1990/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/46]
Former [1990/48]ES,  GR 
TitleGerman:N-terminale Fragmente von menschliches Serumalbumin enthaltenden Fusionsproteinen[1990/48]
English:Fusion proteins containing N-terminal fragments of human serum albumin[1990/48]
French:Protéines de fusion contenant des fragments N-terminaux de l'albumine de sérum humaine[1990/48]
MiscellaneousEPB 1992/36: Verbunden mit 90907285.2/0470165 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 20.07.92
EPB 1992/36: Consolidated with 90907285.2/0470165 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 20.07.92
EPB 1992/36: Jointe à la demande no. 90907285.2/0470165 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 20.07.92
Examination procedure16.05.1991Examination requested  [1991/29]
26.08.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.01.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
26.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.1993Fee for grant paid
22.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0308381  (SKANDIGEN AB [SE], et al);
 [DT]EP0322094  (DELTA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [GB])