Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0405742

EP0405742 - Method for increasing linear bit density in magneto-optical storage media [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUANTUM CORPORATION
500 McCarthy Boulevard
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/13]For all designated states
QUANTUM CORPORATION
500 McCarthy Boulevard
Milpitas California 95035 / US
Former [1991/01]For all designated states
DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
111 Powdermill Road
Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Neville K.S.
59 Sherborn Road
Sherborn, Massachusetts 01770 / US
[1991/01]
Representative(s)Goodman, Christopher , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/01]Goodman, Christopher , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date90305396.518.05.1990
[1991/01]
Priority number, dateUS1989037399129.06.1989         Original published format: US 373991
[1991/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0405742
Date:02.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0405742
Date:09.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0405742
Date:25.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/18, G11B11/10
[1991/46]
Former International [1991/01]G11B11/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erhöhung der linearen Schreibdichte in magnetooptischen Speichermedien[1991/01]
English:Method for increasing linear bit density in magneto-optical storage media[1991/01]
French:Méthode d'augmentation de la densité linéaire d'enregistrement dans les milieux d'emmagasinage magnéto-optique[1991/01]
Examination procedure01.06.1990Examination requested  [1991/01]
26.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.1995Fee for grant paid
20.07.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199405   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.1994
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK25.10.1995
ES25.10.1995
GR25.10.1995
SE25.01.1996
LU31.05.1996
[2002/24]
Former [2000/04]DK25.10.1995
GR25.10.1995
SE25.01.1996
LU31.05.1996
Former [1998/15]DK25.10.1995
SE25.01.1996
Former [1996/23]SE25.01.1996
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP58177535  ;
 [A]JP61039251  ;
 [Y]DE2652795  ;
 [XPD]EP0341829
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 18 (P-250)(1455) 26 January 1984, & JP-A-58 177535 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 18 October 1983,, & JP58177535 A 19831018
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 195 (P-475)(2251) 09 July 1986, & JP-A-61 039251 (SONY CORP.) 25 February 1986,, & JP61039251 A 19860225