EP0404560 - multiprocessor system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/52] | Improved multiprocessor system | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94303 / US | [1997/47] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states KENDALL SQUARE RESEARCH CORPORATION 170 Tracer Lane Waltham Massachusetts 02154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Steven J. 6 Tiffany Trail Hopkinton, Massachusetts 02148 / US | 02 /
Burkhardt, Henry, III 7 Gales Point Manchester, Massachusetts 01944 / US | 03 /
Rothnie, James B. 47 Monmouth Street Brookline, Massachusetts 01945 / US | 04 /
Margulies, Benson I. 30 Pine Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02174 / US | 05 /
Weber, Frederick D. 178 Virginia Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | 06 /
Lee, Linda Q. 28 Hurlbut Street, No. 6 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1997/01] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1990/52] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306777.5 | 21.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | US19890370287 | 22.06.1989 Original published format: US 370287 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404560 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404560 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404560 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F12/08 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
G06F9/3865 (EP);
G06F11/004 (EP);
G06F15/17337 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/52] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Multiprozessorsystem und Verfahren | [1998/37] | English: | multiprocessor system and method | [1998/37] | French: | Système et procédé multiprocesseur | [1998/38] |
Former [1990/52] | Multiprozessorsystem | ||
Former [1990/52] | Improved multiprocessor system | ||
Former [1990/52] | Système multiprocesseur | Examination procedure | 08.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12) | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Request for further processing for: | 02.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.1999 | Decision despatched | 08.04.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 18.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1997 | 30.06.1998 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2000 | BE | 09.08.2000 | CH | 09.08.2000 | ES | 09.08.2000 | GR | 09.08.2000 | IT | 09.08.2000 | LI | 09.08.2000 | DK | 09.11.2000 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
GR | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
DK | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
DK | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 09.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4622631 (FRANK STEVEN J [US], et al); | [Y]EP0229932 (ELSAG [IT]); | [A]EP0273612 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [Y]EP0312194 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | by applicant | GB2178205 | EP0322117 | EP0322116 | US5055999 | US19870136701 | US19890370325 |