Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0408306

EP0408306 - Piezoelectric/electrostrictive actuator having at least one piezoelectric/electrostrictive film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.1997
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.1997 [1997/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/37]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP
For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [1991/03]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeuchi, Yukihisa
17 Aza-Toride, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 458 / JP
02 / Kimura, Koji
2111-2 Ohaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken 485 / JP
03 / Komazawa, Masato
38-2 Ichioka-cho 2-chome, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467 / JP
[1991/03]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/06]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1991/03]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward
MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street
London EC4A 1BQ / GB
Application number, filing date90307520.810.07.1990
[1991/03]
Priority number, dateJP1989017874711.07.1989         Original published format: JP 17874789
JP1990001117420.01.1990         Original published format: JP 1117490
[1991/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0408306
Date:16.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0408306
Date:30.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0408306
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.1991
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/09, H01L41/24
[1991/45]
Former International [1991/03]H01L41/09
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/03]
TitleGerman:Einen piezoelektrischen/elektrostriktiven Film enthaltende piezoelektrischer/elektrostriktiver Antrieb[1991/03]
English:Piezoelectric/electrostrictive actuator having at least one piezoelectric/electrostrictive film[1991/03]
French:Organe d'actionnement piézo-électrique/électrostrictif comportant au moins une couche piézoélectrique/électrostrictive[1991/03]
Examination procedure27.08.1990Examination requested  [1991/03]
10.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.1996Fee for grant paid
22.01.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2161647  ;
 [X]FR2570223  ;
 [XP]WO8907259