blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0413505

EP0413505 - Generalized viterbi decoding algorithms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1991/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Seshadri, Nambirajan
125 Country Club Lane
Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US
02 / Sundberg, Carl-Erik W.
25 Hickory Place A-11
Chatham, New Jersey 07928 / US
[1991/08]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/08]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al
AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date90308749.209.08.1990
[1991/08]
Priority number, dateUS1989039593018.08.1989         Original published format: US 395930
[1991/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0413505
Date:20.02.1991
Language:EN
[1991/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0413505
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1990
ClassificationIPC:H03M13/12, G06F11/10
[1991/08]
CPC:
H03M13/39 (EP); H03M13/4115 (EP); H03M7/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/08]
TitleGerman:Verallgemeinernder Viterbi-Dekodier-Algorithmus[1991/08]
English:Generalized viterbi decoding algorithms[1991/08]
French:Algorithme généralisé de décodage viterbi[1991/08]
Examination procedure05.06.1991Examination requested  [1991/33]
25.01.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.1995Fee for grant paid
18.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3600905  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]);
 [A]DE3721884  (MEYR HEINRICH PROF DR [DE]);
 [A]GB2198615  (TOSHIBA KK);
 [A]EP0052463  ;
 [A]EP0054583  ;
 [A]EP0138598  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0208537  (CODEX CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0210932  (BATTAIL GERARD);
 [A]US4527279  (YASUDA YUTAKA [JP], et al);
 [A]US4545054  (DAVIS ROBERT C [US]);
 [A]US4660214  (PAHLAVAN KAVEH [US], et al);
 [A]US4644564  (DOLIVO FRANCOIS B [CH], et al);
 [A]US4677624  (BETTS WILLIAM L [US], et al);
 [A]US4677626  (BETTS WILLIAM L [US], et al);
 [A]US4730322  (POLLARA-BOZZOLA FABRIZIO [US]);
 [A]US4788694  (CALDERBANK ARTHUR R [US])
ExaminationUS4748626
 US4757506
 US4811346
 US4606027
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.