Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0420586

EP0420586 - A game machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): ES
published on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIGMA, INCORPORATED
32-3, Seijo 9-chome, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]For all designated states
SIGMA, INCORPORATED
32-3, Seijo 9-chome, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagao, Yuji
373-1-202 Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1991/14]
Representative(s)Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date90310496.625.09.1990
[1991/14]
Priority number, dateUS1989041298526.09.1989         Original published format: US 412985
[1991/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0420586
Date:03.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0420586
Date:10.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0420586
Date:09.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/45]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0420586
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1991
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/34
[1991/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/14]
TitleGerman:Spielgerät[1991/14]
English:A game machine[1991/14]
French:Machine de jeu[1991/14]
Examination procedure24.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/14]
21.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1994Fee for grant paid
23.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.07.1995  19.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
BALLY WULFF AUTOMATEN GMBH
Maybachufer 48-51
D-12045 Berlin / DE
 02  07.08.1995  19.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
NSM Aktiengesellschaft
Saarlandstrasse 240
D-55411 Bingen/Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Gossel, Hans K., et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/40]
Opponent(s)01  15.07.1995  19.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
BALLY WULFF AUTOMATEN GMBH
Maybachufer 48-51
D-12045 Berlin / DE
 02  07.08.1995  19.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
NSM Aktiengesellschaft
Saarlandstrasse 240
D-55411 Bingen/Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1995/37]
Opponent(s)01  15.07.1995  19.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
BALLY WULFF AUTOMATEN GMBH
Maybachufer 48-51
D-12045 Berlin / DE
22.09.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.03.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.1997Date of oral proceedings
20.11.1997Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.11.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.04.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.01.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.04.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition15.01.1998Appeal received No.  T0060/98
10.03.1998Statement of grounds filed
25.04.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.04.2003Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB25.09.1997
ES30.09.1997
DE03.06.1998
[2009/29]
Former [2001/31]GB25.09.1997
DE03.06.1998
ES01.03.2001
Former [1998/41]GB25.09.1997
DE03.06.1998
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2092797  ;
 [Y]US4772023  ;
 [A]WO8605407  ;
 [A]FR793198