Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0420586 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0420586



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 928
06.05.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.04.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
15.04.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
15.04.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
15.04.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
09.01.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
09.01.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
09.01.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
09.01.2004 Text intended for grant Opposition 46
08.10.2003 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
29.09.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.09.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.09.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.05.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.05.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.05.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 15
25.04.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
01.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
25.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
24.03.2003 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.03.2003 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.03.2003 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
14.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.03.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.03.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.02.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.02.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
21.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
21.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
21.02.2003 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
10.02.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.02.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
04.12.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.11.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.09.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
06.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.04.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.04.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.03.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
23.03.1998 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.03.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.03.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
05.02.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.02.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.02.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.02.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.02.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.01.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.01.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.01.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.01.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.01.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
29.01.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
29.01.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
22.01.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.01.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.12.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.11.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.11.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.11.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
20.11.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
20.11.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
20.11.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
20.11.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
20.11.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
20.11.1997 Claims Opposition 5
20.11.1997 Claims Opposition 5
20.11.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 17
20.11.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Means of redress Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
20.11.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Text intended for grant Opposition 46
31.10.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.10.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
23.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 18
18.09.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 18
18.09.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
18.09.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
18.09.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
16.09.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 45
26.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.07.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.05.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.05.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.05.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.05.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 15
02.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
15.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.03.1996 Claims Opposition 5
29.03.1996 Description Opposition 4
29.03.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
08.02.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.09.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.09.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.09.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.08.1995 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.08.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.08.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.08.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
07.08.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.08.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
07.08.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
31.07.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.07.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.09.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.07.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.07.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.07.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.04.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
13.04.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.12.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
21.12.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
06.12.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
13.01.1992 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.01.1992 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
17.05.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.05.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
25.09.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.09.1990 Claims Search / examination 5
25.09.1990 Description Search / examination 21
25.09.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.1990 Drawings Search / examination 23
25.09.1990 Priority document Search / examination 54
25.09.1990 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6