Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0477448

EP0477448 - Network monitoring device and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.1996
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [1992/14]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Phaal, Peter
25 The Valls
Bradley Stoke, Bristol / GB
[1992/14]
Representative(s)Squibbs, Robert Francis , et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited
IP Section, Building 3
Filton Road
Stoke Gifford, Bristol
BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]Squibbs, Robert Francis , et al
Intellectual Property Section Building 2 Hewlett-Packard Limited Filton Road
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB
Former [1993/26]Squibbs, Robert Francis
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Filton Road
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB
Former [1992/14]Squibbs, Robert Francis
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley, Lewins House, Lewins Mead
Bristol BS1 2NN / GB
Application number, filing date90310699.528.09.1990
[1992/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0477448
Date:01.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0477448
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.1991
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/26
[1992/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/14]
TitleGerman:Netzüberwachungssystem und -vorrichtung[1992/14]
English:Network monitoring device and system[1992/14]
French:Appareil et système de surveillance de réseau[1992/14]
Examination procedure18.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/46]
16.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.1995Fee for grant paid
03.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.07.1995
[1999/42]
Documents cited:Search[A]  IEEE NETWORK, vol. 1, no. 3, July 1987, pages 32-39; D. RITTER et al.: "A multi-purpose, distributed LAN traffic monitoring tool"
 [A]  IEEE NETWORK, vol. 1, no. 3, July 1987, pages 13-19; M. SOHA: "A distributed approach to LAN monitoring using intelligent high performance monitors"
 [A]  SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE, vol. 16, no. 7, July 1986, pages 671-687; S. VASSILIADES et al.: "A monitor tool for a network based on the cambridge ring"