Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0424119

EP0424119 - Recycling DCT/IDCT integrated circuit apparatus using a single multiplier/accumulator and a single random access memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.1999
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.1999 [1999/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zoran Corporation
1705 Wyatt Drive Santa Clara
California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
ZORAN CORPORATION
1705 Wyatt Drive
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Friedlander, Rami
8 Disraeli Street
Haifa / IL
02 / Retter, Rafi
22 Frank Peleg Street
Haifa / IL
[1991/17]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date90311387.617.10.1990
[1991/17]
Priority number, dateUS1989042407919.10.1989         Original published format: US 424079
[1991/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0424119
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0424119
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/332
[1991/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1991/17]
TitleGerman:Rückführungsintegriertes Schaltungsgerät mit einem einzigen Multiplikator-Akkumulator und einem einzigen Randomspeicher[1991/17]
English:Recycling DCT/IDCT integrated circuit apparatus using a single multiplier/accumulator and a single random access memory[1991/17]
French:Appareil à circuit intégré DCT/IDCT à recyclage utilisant un multiplicateur accumulateur unique et une seule mémoire à accès aléatoire[1991/17]
Examination procedure24.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/03]
23.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.1998Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/13]
30.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1999/13]
Request for further processing for:26.09.1997Request for further processing filed
26.09.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199809   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP0374297  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]);
 [A]EP0289629  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]);
 [A]EP0274323  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]);
 [A]US4831440  (BORGERS STEPHANUS M C [NL], et al)
 [A]  PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP 84, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, NEW YORK, US vol. 1/3, 19 March 1984, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, US pages 4111 - 4114; N.U.CHOWDARY ET AL: 'A HIGH SPEED TWO-DIMENSIONAL FFT PROCESSOR',