Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0428279

EP0428279 - Braid electrode leads and catheters for using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/21]Braid electrode leads and catheters and methods for using the same
[1997/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.1997
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELECTRONICS N.V.
De Ruyterkade 581 P.O. Box 837 Willemstad
Curaçao / AN
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]For all designated states
TELECTRONICS N.V.
De Ruyterkade 581 P.O. Box 837
Willemstad Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Steven E.
14940 S.W. 49th Lane
Miami Florida 33185 / US
[1991/21]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date90311565.722.10.1990
[1991/21]
Priority number, dateUS1989043424613.11.1989         Original published format: US 434246
[1991/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0428279
Date:22.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0428279
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0428279
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05
[1991/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1991/21]
TitleGerman:Geflochtene Elektrodenleitungen und Katheter für ihre Benutzung[1997/01]
English:Braid electrode leads and catheters for using the same[1997/01]
French:Conducteurs d'électrode tressés et cathéters pour leur utilisation[1997/01]
Former [1991/21]Geflochtene Elektrodenleitungen und Verfahren und Kathetern für ihre Benutzung
Former [1991/21]Braid electrode leads and catheters and methods for using the same
Former [1991/21]Conducteurs d'électrode tressés et méthode et cathéters pour leur utilisation
Examination procedure08.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/50]
14.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.12.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1996Fee for grant paid
22.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.01.1997
NL02.01.1997
SE02.04.1997
[2003/07]
Former [1999/42]IT02.01.1997
SE02.04.1997
Former [1998/11]SE02.04.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]US4295270  ;
 [A]EP0306442  ;
 [A]US4481953  ;
 [A]US4592372  ;
 [AP]US4940064  ;
 [A]EP0037223  ;
 [A]US4444206