blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0428279

EP0428279 - Braid electrode leads and catheters for using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/21]Braid electrode leads and catheters and methods for using the same
[1997/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELECTRONICS N.V.
De Ruyterkade 581 P.O. Box 837 Willemstad
Curaçao / AN
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]For all designated states
TELECTRONICS N.V.
De Ruyterkade 581 P.O. Box 837
Willemstad Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Steven E.
14940 S.W. 49th Lane
Miami Florida 33185 / US
[1991/21]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date90311565.722.10.1990
[1991/21]
Priority number, dateUS1989043424613.11.1989         Original published format: US 434246
[1991/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0428279
Date:22.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0428279
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0428279
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/05
[1991/21]
CPC:
A61N1/056 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1991/21]
TitleGerman:Geflochtene Elektrodenleitungen und Katheter für ihre Benutzung[1997/01]
English:Braid electrode leads and catheters for using the same[1997/01]
French:Conducteurs d'électrode tressés et cathéters pour leur utilisation[1997/01]
Former [1991/21]Geflochtene Elektrodenleitungen und Verfahren und Kathetern für ihre Benutzung
Former [1991/21]Braid electrode leads and catheters and methods for using the same
Former [1991/21]Conducteurs d'électrode tressés et méthode et cathéters pour leur utilisation
Examination procedure08.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/50]
14.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.12.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1996Fee for grant paid
22.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.01.1997
NL02.01.1997
SE02.04.1997
[2003/07]
Former [1999/42]IT02.01.1997
SE02.04.1997
Former [1998/11]SE02.04.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0037223  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]);
 [A]US4295270  (CAMMARATA JACOB J);
 [A]US4444206  (GOLD PHILIP [US]);
 [A]US4481953  (GOLD PHILIP [US], et al);
 [A]US4592372  (BERANEK WILLIAM J [US]);
 [A]EP0306442  (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]);
 [AP]US4940064  (DESAI JAWAHAR M [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.