EP0425313 - Mount system for elevator guide rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garrido, Alfonso Principe de Vergara, 28 E-28001 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Sevilleja, Jose La del Manojo de Rosas, 95 E-28041 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Cabanas, Julian Plaza de la Regenta, 8 Rivas-Vaciamadrid, Madrid / ES | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1991/18] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311783.6 | 26.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | US19890427055 | 26.10.1989 Original published format: US 427055 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0425313 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0425313 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0425313 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B66B19/00, B66B7/02 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
B66B7/024 (EP,US);
B66B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/18] | Title | German: | Einbausystem für Aufzugsführungsleisten | [1991/18] | English: | Mount system for elevator guide rails | [1991/18] | French: | Système d'assemblage pour des rails de guidages d'ascenseurs | [1991/18] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1995
13.10.2004
WITHDRAWN INVENTIO AG CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1995
13.10.2004
WITHDRAWN INVENTIO AG CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Flügel Preissner Kastel Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1995
15.09.1995
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1995
15.09.1995
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | 13.10.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.12.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 13.11.2004 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2005/14] | Appeal following opposition | 15.04.1999 | Appeal received No. T0397/99 | 22.06.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.05.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 31.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.10.1998 | ES | 27.10.1998 | FR | 30.06.1999 | DE | 03.08.1999 | [2004/37] |
Former [2001/31] | GB | 26.10.1998 | |
FR | 30.06.1999 | ||
DE | 03.08.1999 | ||
ES | 16.01.2001 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 26.10.1998 | |
FR | 30.06.1999 | ||
DE | 03.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | GB | 26.10.1998 | |
DE | 03.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 26.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4593794 (RUSSEAU RAYMOND J [US]); | [A]US3948358 (ATKEY RICHARD E); | [A]US3199642 (CLIFFORD ANDERSON GEORGE); | [A]EP0149773 (INVENTIO AG [CH]); | [A]US4079817 (TOSATO LAWRENCE P, et al) |