Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0425313 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0425313



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 414
17.02.2005 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
17.02.2005 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
14.02.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
09.12.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2004 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2004 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2004 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
13.10.2004 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
11.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.05.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.04.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.04.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.04.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
15.04.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
15.04.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
31.03.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.08.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.08.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.06.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.06.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
31.05.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
31.05.2001 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
31.05.2001 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
11.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
24.04.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.03.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.03.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.03.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.03.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
08.03.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
10.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
27.08.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
17.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 34
07.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.07.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.06.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.06.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
14.05.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.05.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.05.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.04.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.02.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.02.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.02.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.02.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
22.02.1999 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
22.02.1999 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
22.02.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
22.02.1999 Means of redress Opposition 1
20.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.1998 Claims Opposition 2
14.11.1998 Claims Opposition 2
14.11.1998 Claims Opposition 1
14.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
10.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 12
06.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
24.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.08.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.08.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.07.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.07.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
09.07.1998 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
09.07.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
09.07.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.06.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.01.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
22.05.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
10.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
24.12.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.09.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.08.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.06.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.05.1996 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
18.05.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
16.05.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
29.04.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
28.02.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.02.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
13.10.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.09.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
04.11.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.09.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.09.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.09.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 3
17.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.08.1994 General enquiry Search / examination 1
06.08.1994 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.08.1994 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.06.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.06.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 4
09.06.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 5
08.06.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 3
02.06.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 3
31.05.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.05.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.04.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.01.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 4
29.12.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
28.10.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.10.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
28.10.1993 Description Search / examination 5
28.10.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
24.08.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.08.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.11.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
26.10.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.10.1990 Claims Search / examination 2
26.10.1990 Description Search / examination 5
26.10.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.10.1990 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.10.1990 Priority document Search / examination 12
26.10.1990 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
17.06.1987 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1