Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0429189

EP0429189 - Use of Sertraline for the manufacture of a medicament for treating obsessive-compulsive disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/22]A method of treating anxiety related disorders using sertraline
[2000/26]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/22]For all designated states
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Doogan, Declan P.
37, Rochester Avenue
Canterbury, Kent / GB
02 / Scappaticci, Karen A.
205 East 77th Street
New York, New York / US
03 / Hackett, Elizabeth
201, East 79th Street
New York, New York / US
[1991/22]
Representative(s)Ruddock, Keith Stephen , et al
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Ruddock, Keith Stephen , et al
Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [1991/22]Wood, David John , et al
PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date90311797.629.10.1990
[1991/22]
Priority number, dateUS1989043100002.11.1989         Original published format: US 431000
[1991/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0429189
Date:29.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0429189
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0429189
Date:23.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/135
[1991/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/22]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Sertraline zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von obsessiv-kompulsiven Erkrankungen[2000/26]
English:Use of Sertraline for the manufacture of a medicament for treating obsessive-compulsive disorders[2000/26]
French:Utilisation de la sertraline dans la fabrication d'un médicament destiné au traitement des troubles obsessifs compulsifs[2000/26]
Former [1991/22]Verwendung von Sertralin bei einer Methode zur Behandlung von Angstzuständen
Former [1991/22]A method of treating anxiety related disorders using sertraline
Former [1991/22]Utilisation de sertraline dans une méthode pour le traitement des désordres relatifs à l'angoisse
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
06.11.1990Examination requested  [1991/22]
11.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
10.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
22.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2000Date of oral proceedings
05.05.2000Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2001Fee for grant paid
20.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01103959.1  / EP1129708
EP01103962.5  / EP1127571
EP01103963.3  / EP1125581
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2002  10.06.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Egis Gyogyszergyar RT.
Kereszturi ut 30-38
1106 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Beszédes, Stephan G.
Patentanwalt
Postfach 11 68
85201 Dachau / DE
 02  22.10.2002  04.11.2002  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Straus, Alexander, et al
Patentanwälte
Becker, Kurig, Straus
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/51]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2002  10.06.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Egis Gyogyszergyar RT.
Kereszturi ut 30-38
1106 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr.
Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68
85201 Dachau / DE
 02  22.10.2002   
KRKA
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Straus, Alexander, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/29]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2002  10.06.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Egis Gyogyszergyar RT.
Kereszturi ut 30-38
1106 Budapest / HU
Opponent's representative
Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr.
Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68
85201 Dachau / DE
29.11.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.12.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/20]
Appeal following opposition18.09.1995Appeal received No.  T0158/96
27.12.1995Statement of grounds filed
28.10.1998Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Request for further processing for:15.03.2001Request for further processing filed
15.03.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.03.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
08.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 11
16.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0357369
 [Y]  - J. CLIN. PSYCHIATRY, vol. 49, no. 8 (suppl.), August 1988, pages 40-45; J. HEYM et al.: "Pharmacology of sertraline: A review"
 [Y]  - J. CLIN. PSYCHIATRY, vol. 49, no. 8 (suppl.), August 1988, pages 30-36; D.V. SHEEHAN et al.: "Panic disorder: The potential role of serotonin reuptake inhibitors"
 [Y]  - OHIO STATE MED. J., vol. 75, no. 10, 1979, pages 653-655; D.G. LOGAN: "Antidepressant treatment of recurrent anxiety attacks and night terrors"