Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0429189 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0429189



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 720
07.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
26.03.2004 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
26.03.2004 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
26.03.2004 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
26.03.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
30.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2003 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
12.12.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
16.05.2003 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition Opposition 1
18.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2002 Submission filed by the opponent/representative Opposition 2
29.11.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.11.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.10.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.10.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
22.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
22.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
04.06.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.05.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.05.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.05.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.05.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.05.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
23.05.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.12.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
16.03.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.03.2001 Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.03.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 6
27.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
02.10.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
05.05.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 11
28.12.1999 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
03.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.11.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.10.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.10.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.07.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.07.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.05.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
19.05.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 8
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 8
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 22
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 14
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 9
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 5
12.03.1999 Annex Search / examination 3
12.03.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.02.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.11.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.10.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
28.10.1998 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
19.10.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
07.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
07.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.10.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
07.10.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
28.09.1998 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.09.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.1998 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
26.08.1998 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
25.05.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.05.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.05.1998 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
18.05.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.05.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.05.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 1
07.03.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.03.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
28.02.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.01.1996 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
27.12.1995 Annex Appeal 6
27.12.1995 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.12.1995 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 21
27.12.1995 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
27.12.1995 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.12.1995 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
27.12.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
26.09.1995 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
20.09.1995 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.09.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.08.1995 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 10
22.03.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.11.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 18
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 5
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 10
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 6
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 21
27.07.1994 Annex Search / examination 4
27.07.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
27.07.1994 Description Search / examination 4
27.07.1994 Description Search / examination 4
27.07.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.07.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.06.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.02.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.02.1994 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.01.1994 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
23.12.1993 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.12.1993 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 3
23.11.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.11.1993 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.09.1993 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
26.08.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.1993 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
16.07.1993 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
12.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.03.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.01.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.01.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.09.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.02.1992 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.12.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
11.01.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.01.1991 Priority document Search / examination 13
29.10.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Claims Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Description Search / examination 6
29.10.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5