Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0427485

EP0427485 - Speech synthesis apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.1997
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.1997 [1997/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/20]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kosaka, Tetsuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sakurai, Atsushi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Tamura, Junichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Ohora, Yasunori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Fujita, Takeshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Aso, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Kawasaki, Katsuhiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1991/20]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/20]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date90312074.905.11.1990
[1991/20]
Priority number, dateJP1989028973506.11.1989         Original published format: JP 28973589
JP1989034347027.12.1989         Original published format: JP 34347089
JP1989034311229.12.1989         Original published format: JP 34311289
JP1989034311329.12.1989         Original published format: JP 34311389
JP1989034311929.12.1989         Original published format: JP 34311989
JP1989034312729.12.1989         Original published format: JP 34312789
[1991/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0427485
Date:15.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0427485
Date:21.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0427485
Date:14.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.1991
ClassificationInternational:G10L5/04
[1991/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Sprachsynthese[1991/20]
English:Speech synthesis apparatus and method[1991/20]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la synthèse de la parole[1991/20]
Examination procedure31.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/20]
16.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.02.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.1996Fee for grant paid
17.04.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1922170
 [A]  - JAPAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, vol. 23, no. 4, October 1981, pages 383-390, Tokyo, JP; Y. IMAI et al.: "Shared audio information system using new audio response unit"
 [A]  - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Tokyo, 7th - 11th April 1986, pages 2019-2022, IEEE, New York, US; T. YAZU et al.: "The speech synthesis system for an unlimited Japanese vocabulary"
 [A]  - SPEECH COMMUNICATION, vol. 7, no. 1, March 1988, pages 55-65, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; D. O'SHAUGHNESSY et al.: "Diphone speech synthesis"
 [A]  - EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2, September 1987, pages 177-180, Edinburg, GB; M. KUGLER-KRUSE et al.: "Methods for the simulation of natural intonation in the "Syrub" text-to-speech system for unrestricted German text"
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 31, no. 8, January 1989, pages 147-149, Armonk, NY, US; "Method for connecting speech synthesis units"