Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0435527

EP0435527 - Picture element encoding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.03.1996 [1996/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/27]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Howard, Edwin Olin
110 Cone Road
Ormond Beach, Florida 32174 / US
02 / Morgan, Michael Leroy
104 Oaklane Rte. 1
Ormond Beach, Florida 32174 / US
03 / Steiner, Walter Robert
32 Marjorie Trail
Ormond Beach, Florida 32174 / US
04 / Buchner, Gregory Charles
2240 Brian Avenue
South Daytona, Florida 32019 / US
05 / Economy, Richard
1309 Oak Drive
Ormont Beach, Florida 32174 / US
06 / Sims, Edward Mitford
1429 Oak Forest Drive
Ormont Beach, Florida 32174 / US
[1991/27]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London
WC2R 3AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/27]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date90313637.214.12.1990
[1991/27]
Priority number, dateUS1989045787627.12.1989         Original published format: US 457876
[1991/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0435527
Date:03.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0435527
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.1991
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/14
[1991/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/27]
TitleGerman:Kodierung eines Bildelementes[1991/27]
English:Picture element encoding[1991/27]
French:Codage d'un élément d'image[1991/27]
Examination procedure16.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/08]
14.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.08.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.1994Fee for grant paid
14.11.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4720745  ;
 [A]US4803548  ;
 [A]US4258393