Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0420743

EP0420743 - Vaccine protecting against porcine hemophilus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MERIAL
17, rue Bourgelat
69002 Lyon / FR
[1997/52]
Former [1991/14]For all designated states
RHONE MERIEUX
17, rue Bourgelat
F-69002 Lyon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Desmettre, Philippe
15 rue B. Tabard
F-69130 Ecully / FR
02 / Milward, Francis
2 Allée de Baraillon
F-69160 Tassin / FR
03 / Prevost, Philippe
12 rue Perrod
F-69004 Lyon / FR
04 / Rolland, Eric
51 rue Lieut. Col. Girard
F-69007 Lyon / FR
[1991/14]
Representative(s)Bernasconi, Jean Raymond , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Bernasconi, Jean Raymond , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [1995/34]Bernasconi, Jean , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR
Former [1991/14]Bernasconi, Jean
Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date90402639.025.09.1990
[1991/14]
Priority number, dateFR1989001256726.09.1989         Original published format: FR 8912567
[1991/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0420743
Date:03.04.1991
Language:FR
[1991/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0420743
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/102
[1991/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/14]
TitleGerman:Impfstoff zum Schutz gegen Schweinhämophilus[1991/14]
English:Vaccine protecting against porcine hemophilus[1991/14]
French:Vaccin protecteur contre l'hémophilose porcine[1991/14]
Examination procedure20.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/48]
30.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.06.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.1999Fee for grant paid
03.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Request for further processing for:18.06.1996Request for further processing filed
18.06.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.07.1996Decision despatched
02.12.1994Request for further processing filed
02.12.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
27.02.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
17.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Former [2001/16]FR07.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]RO90029  ;
 [Y]JP56039024  ;
 [Y]JP56039023  ;
 [Y]GB2197193  (OLDCASTLE VETERINARY RESEARCH);
 [Y]WO8002113  (NORDISK DROGE & KEMIKALIE AS [DK], et al)
 [X]  COMMONWEALTH AGRICULTURAL BUREAUX abrégé no. 0141079, Castelar, Argentina; J.M. MIQUET et al: "Immunizing Pigs against Contagious Pleuropneumonia. I. Preliminary Trial" & Gaceta Veterinaria 1983, vol. 45, no. 381, pages 626,629-636,
 [X]  COMMONWEALTH AGRICULTURAL BUREAUX abrégé no. 0520089, Castelar, Argentina; S. ROSENDAL et al.: "Protective Efficacy of Casule Extracts of Haemophilus Pleuropneumoniae in Pigs and Mice" & Veterinary Microbiology 1986, vol. 12, no. 3, pages 229-240,
 [YD]  R. HESSE: "HAEMOPHILUS PLEUROPNEUMONIA VACCINATION / CHALLENGE STUDIES" 1984, page 111, IPVS de Ghent, Belgique,
 [Y]  VACCINE vol. 5, no. 4, décembre 1987, page 319, Londres, GB; INSTITUT PASTEUR BUCHAREST: "Attenuated Haemophilus pleuropneumoniae strain is nonheamolytic and nonpathogenic intranasally or intracheally; preparation from a more virulent strain" & RO-A-90 029 (30 août 1986),
 [Y]  BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACT abrégé no. 84004412; L. MOLNAR et al.: "Pleuropneumonia caused by Haemophilus-Pleuropneumoniae Equals Haemphilus-Parahaemolyticus in Swine." & VI. Field Vaccination Trials and Magy Allatory Lapja, vol. 42, no. 1, 1987, pages 23-28,
 [Y]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 105, no. 25, 22 décembre 1986, page 581, abrégé no. 224115r, Columbus, Ohio, US; W.B. FENWICK et al.: "Immune responses to the lipopolysaccharides and capsular polysaccharides of Haemophilus pleuropneumoniae in convalescent and immunized pigs" & Infect. Immun. 1986, vol. 54, no. 2, pages 575-582,
 [Y]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 95, no. 1, 6 juillet 1981, page 365, abstract no. 12749a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-56 039 024 (JAPAN BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE RESEARCH INST. et al.) 14.04.1981,
 [Y]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 95, no. 4, 27 juillet 1981, page 339, abrégé no. 30390f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-56 039 023 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS) 14.04.1981,
Examination   CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 1, 06 juillet 1981, Columbus, OH (US); p. 365, no. 12749a#,
    CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 4, 27 juillet 1981, Columbus, OH (US); p. 339, no. 30390f#,