Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0424209

EP0424209 - Escalator with verical planar step risers and constant horizontal velocity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/17]Curved escalator with vertical planar step risers and constant horizontal velocity
[1993/48]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  26.11.1999
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
10 Farm Springs
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sansevero, Frank M.
23 Oakwood Avenue, Apt. A-2
West Hartford, Connecticut 06119 / US
[1991/17]
Representative(s)Jolly, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]Jolly, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date90402774.505.10.1990
[1991/17]
Priority number, dateUS1989042226516.10.1989         Original published format: US 422265
[1991/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0424209
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0424209
Date:12.06.1991
Language:EN
[1991/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0424209
Date:01.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0424209
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.1991
ClassificationInternational:B66B21/06
[1991/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/17]
TitleGerman:Rolltreppe mit senkrechter ebener Stufenhöhe und konstanter horizontaler Geschwindigkeit[1993/48]
English:Escalator with verical planar step risers and constant horizontal velocity[1993/48]
French:Escalier roulant avec des hauteurs de marches verticales planaires et avec vitesse costante horizontale[1993/48]
Former [1991/17]Bogenförmige Rolltreppe mit senkrechter ebener Stufenhöhe und konstanter horizontaler Geschwindigkeit
Former [1991/17]Curved escalator with vertical planar step risers and constant horizontal velocity
Former [1991/17]Escalier roulant courbé avec des hauteurs de marches verticales planaires et avec vitesse constante horizontale
Examination procedure22.06.1991Examination requested  [1991/34]
04.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.1993Fee for grant paid
23.08.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.08.1994  12.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
O&K Orenstein & Koppel Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 17 02 18
44061 Dortmund / DE
 [1994/43]
30.09.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.01.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.01.1995Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
19.05.1995Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
21.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.02.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.02.1998Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.08.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.11.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB05.10.1997
FR31.10.1997
DE01.07.1998
[2002/33]
Former [1999/01]GB05.10.1997
DE01.07.1998
Former [1998/41]GB05.10.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0118813  ;
 [A]US4434884  ;
 [AD]DE3441845  ;
 [AD]US3878931  ;
 [AD]DE3432961  ;
 [AD]EP0103489  ;
 [AD]EP0141519