blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0379457

EP0379457 - Portable machine for automatic stapling, and staple so applied [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.1991
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOLEMECANE S.A.R.L.
21-23, rue Eugène Levasseur
F-93230 Romainville / FR
[1990/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Chazal, Marc
12, rue Moissan
F-93130 Noisy-Le-Sec / FR
02 / Mongendre, Alain
107, avenue des Arts
F-93370 Montfermeil / FR
[1990/30]
Representative(s)Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni
1a Place Boecler
B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
Former [1990/30]Metz, Paul
Cabinet METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63
F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date90440005.818.01.1990
[1990/30]
Priority number, dateFR1989000073218.01.1989         Original published format: FR 8900732
FR1989000073318.01.1989         Original published format: FR 8900733
[1990/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0379457
Date:25.07.1990
Language:FR
[1990/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0379457
Date:10.10.1990
Language:FR
[1990/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1990
ClassificationIPC:B27F7/21
[1990/30]
CPC:
F16B15/00 (EP); A47G1/22 (EP); B27F7/21 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1990/30]
TitleGerman:Bewegliches Gerät für das Einsetzen von Stapeln und Stapel dafür[1990/30]
English:Portable machine for automatic stapling, and staple so applied[1990/30]
French:Machine portable pour la pose automatique d'agrafes et agrafe ainsi posée[1990/30]
File destroyed:12.03.1999
Examination procedure11.04.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/50]
16.07.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1991/50]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB769544  [ ];
 WO8501788  [ ];
 US3448909  [ ];
 US1746496  [ ];
 US4318555  [ ];
 US2242967  [ ];
 AU514303B  [ ];
 FR709698  [ ];
 US4770334  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.