blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0424296

EP0424296 - Composite loading platform for a car transporting vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.1995
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LOHR INDUSTRIE
29, rue du 14 Juillet
67980 Hangenbieten / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
LOHR INDUSTRIE
29, rue du 14 Juillet
F-67980 Hangenbieten / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Vogel, Lucien
14 Impasse des Pâquerettes, Offenheim
F-67370 Truchtersheim / FR
[1991/17]
Representative(s)Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni
1a Place Boecler
B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/09]Metz, Paul
CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63
F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR
Former [1991/17]Metz, Paul
Cabinet METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau, B.P. no 63
F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date90440090.017.10.1990
[1991/17]
Priority number, dateFR1989001372217.10.1989         Original published format: FR 8913722
[1991/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0424296
Date:24.04.1991
Language:FR
[1991/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0424296
Date:15.06.1994
Language:FR
[1994/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.1991
ClassificationIPC:B60P3/08
[1991/17]
CPC:
B60P3/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/17]
TitleGerman:Mehrteilige Ladefläche für ein Fahrzeug des Autotransportertyps[1991/17]
English:Composite loading platform for a car transporting vehicle[1991/17]
French:Plan de chargement composite pour véhicule du type porte-voitures[1991/17]
Examination procedure08.07.1991Examination requested  [1991/36]
23.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.1994Fee for grant paid
23.03.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.03.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK15.06.1994
GR15.06.1994
SE15.09.1994
LU31.10.1994
[2000/04]
Former [1998/15]DK15.06.1994
SE15.09.1994
Former [1995/05]SE15.09.1994
Documents cited:Search[A]US2085214  (FRANCIS LYNN M);
 [A]US3104127  (JOHN SWARTZWELDER);
 [Y]US3145043  (GYORI EMERY A, et al);
 [A]US3690717  (TAYLOR GLENN EDWARD);
 [Y]EP0001364  (LOHR SA [FR]);
 [A]DE3042739  (GRAAFF KG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.