Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0437160

EP0437160 - Main storage memory cards having single bit set and reset functions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/29]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eikill, Richard Glenn
730 31th Street N.E.
Rochester, Minnesota 55904 / US
02 / Schmierer, Quentin Gust
1765 25th Avenue N.W.
Rochesterm Minnesota 55901 / US
[1991/29]
Representative(s)de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
Former [1991/29]Colas, Alain
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date90480174.331.10.1990
[1991/29]
Priority number, dateUS1989045018213.12.1989         Original published format: US 450182
[1991/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0437160
Date:17.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0437160
Date:13.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0437160
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1992
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, G06F13/42, G11C7/00
[1993/02]
Former International [1991/29]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/29]
TitleGerman:Hauptspeicherkarten mit Einzelbit-Setz- und Rücksetz-Funktion[1991/29]
English:Main storage memory cards having single bit set and reset functions[1991/29]
French:Cartes mémoires principales ne comprenant qu'un seul bit de fonction de positionnement et de remise à l'état initial[1991/29]
Examination procedure13.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/29]
20.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.1999Fee for grant paid
12.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:23.12.1998Request for further processing filed
23.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.01.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
17.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
17.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US4712190  ;
 [A]US4663728  ;
 [A]EP0188059