Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0394193

EP0394193 - Coated membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.1996
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEMBRANE PRODUCTS KIRYAT WEIZMANN LTD.
P.O.B. 138
Rehovot 76 101 / IL
[1993/25]
Former [1990/43]For all designated states
ALIGENA AG
Freie Strasse 103
CH-4051 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Linder, Charles, Dr.
Derech Yavneh
Rehovot / IL
02 / Nemas, Mara
28 Hatamar Street (ap.15)
Neve Monoson / IL
03 / Perry, Mordechai, Dr.
4 Kaff-Zai'in Benisan St.
Petach Tikva / IL
04 / Ketraro, Reuven
11 Hakovesh St.
Rishon Letzion / IL
[1990/43]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Hans , et al
A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1996/12]Zimmermann, Hans , et al
A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Postfach 160
CH-4003 Basel / CH
Former [1990/43]Becher, Pauline, Dr. , et al
A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Patentanwälte Holbeinstrasse 36-38
CH-4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date90810288.210.04.1990
[1990/43]
Priority number, dateIL1970000089914.04.1989         Original published format: IL 89970
[1990/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0394193
Date:24.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0394193
Date:09.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0394193
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1990
ClassificationInternational:B01D69/12, B01D61/02, B01D61/14
[1990/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/43]
TitleGerman:Beschichtete Membranen[1990/43]
English:Coated membranes[1990/43]
French:Membranes revêtues[1990/43]
MiscellaneousEPB 1995/50: Teilanmeldung 93111792.3 eingereicht am 10/04/90
EPB 1995/50: Divisional application 93111792.3 filed on 10/04/90
EPB 1995/50: Demande divisionnaire 93111792.3 déposée le 10/04/90
Examination procedure15.02.1991Examination requested  [1991/15]
22.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1995Fee for grant paid
04.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP93111792.3  / EP0574957
Opposition(s)14.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.1995
BE13.12.1995
CH13.12.1995
DK13.12.1995
ES13.12.1995
IT13.12.1995
LI13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
[2002/25]
Former [1999/42]AT13.12.1995
BE13.12.1995
CH13.12.1995
DK13.12.1995
IT13.12.1995
LI13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
Former [1998/15]AT13.12.1995
BE13.12.1995
CH13.12.1995
DK13.12.1995
LI13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
Former [1997/13]AT13.12.1995
BE13.12.1995
CH13.12.1995
LI13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
Former [1996/42]AT13.12.1995
BE13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
Former [1996/32]BE13.12.1995
SE13.03.1996
Former [1996/31]BE13.12.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0242761  ;
 [A]EP0111714