Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0452381

EP0452381 - MILKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  29.03.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.1996Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 15.05.1996 [1996/20]
29.03.1996Change - representativepublished on 15.05.1996 [1996/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/36]For all designated states
BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED
101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
Former [1991/43]For all designated states
NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / STREET, Michael, John
34 Cutcliffe Grove
Bedford MK40 4DD / GB
02 / BENSON, John, Alan
3 Tithe Road Wood End Wooton
Bedfordshire MK43 9BE / GB
03 / MARCHANT, John, Arthur
19 Harrington Drive
Bedford MK41 8DB / GB
04 / WILKIN, Arthur, Leonard
41 Hawthorn Close Hitchin
Hertfordshire SG5 2BP / GB
05 / ALLEN, Clive, John
58 Red Rose Binfield Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 5LD / GB
[1991/43]
Representative(s)Scott, Susan Margaret , et al
British Technology Group Ltd.
5 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7RD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/20]Scott, Susan Margaret , et al
British Technology Group Ltd. 101, Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
Former [1992/36]Chandler, Derek Richard , et al
Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
Former [1991/43]Chandler, Derek Richard
Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
Application number, filing date90901625.503.01.1990
[1991/43]
WO1990GB00004
Priority number, dateGB1989000008404.01.1989         Original published format: GB 8900084
[1991/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9007268
Date:12.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0452381
Date:23.10.1991
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1990
[1991/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0452381
Date:22.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.1990
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/00
[1991/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1991/43]
TitleGerman:MELKEN[1991/43]
English:MILKING[1991/43]
French:TRAITE[1991/43]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1991National basic fee paid 
02.07.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
02.07.1991Examination requested  [1991/43]
14.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.1993Fee for grant paid
02.09.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.09.1994  30.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
PROLION B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 289B
NL-2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1994/47]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.1994  30.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
PROLION B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 289B
NL-2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1
NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL
24.10.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.05.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.1995Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
24.11.1995Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
22.12.1995Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
01.01.1996Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2408300  ;
 [A]EP0091892  ;
 [A]EP0191517  ;
 [A]US4010714  ;
 [A]FR2595197