Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0455740

EP0455740 - PORTABLE LASER SCANNER WITH INTEGRAL SCANNER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/46]PORTABLE LASER SCANNER WITH INTEGRAL SCANNER ENGINE
[1998/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.02.1999
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METROLOGIC INSTRUMENTS, INC.
P.O. Box 307 143 Harding Avenue Bellmawr
New Jersey 08031 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/46]For all designated states
METROLOGIC INSTRUMENTS, INC.
P.O. Box 307 143 Harding Avenue
Bellmawr New Jersey 08031 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KNOWLES, Carl, H.
425 East Linden Street
Moorestown, NJ 08057 / US
[1991/46]
Representative(s)Shaw, Laurence
5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
[1991/46]
Application number, filing date90903534.718.01.1990
[1991/46]
WO1990US00339
Priority number, dateUS1989030337626.01.1989         Original published format: US 303376
[1991/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9009008
Date:09.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0455740
Date:13.11.1991
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990
[1991/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0455740
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.1990
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[1991/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/46]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARER LASERABTASTER MIT EINGEBAUTEM ABTASTMODUL[1998/17]
English:PORTABLE LASER SCANNER WITH INTEGRAL SCANNER MODULE[1998/17]
French:SCANNER LASER PORTATIF A MODULE SCANNER INTEGRE[1998/17]
Former [1991/46]TRAGBARER LASERABTASTER MIT EINGEBAUTEM ABTASTGERÄT
Former [1991/46]PORTABLE LASER SCANNER WITH INTEGRAL SCANNER ENGINE
Former [1991/46]SCANNER LASER PORTATIF A MOTEUR INTEGRE
Entry into regional phase21.08.1991National basic fee paid 
21.08.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
26.07.1991Examination requested  [1991/46]
29.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.1997Fee for grant paid
24.11.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)23.01.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15]
Request for further processing for:10.12.1997Request for further processing filed
24.11.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.12.1997Decision despatched
09.12.1997Request for further processing filed
24.11.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
23.12.1997Decision despatched
17.11.1997Request for further processing filed
24.11.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
23.12.1997Decision despatched
03.01.1996Request for further processing filed
31.01.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
22.02.1996Decision despatched
23.10.1995Request for further processing filed
31.01.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
22.02.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
Former [1998/52]FR18.09.1998
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0262943  ;
 [Y]US4575625  ;
 [A]US4607156  ;
 [XP]US4805175
ExaminationWO2008000364
 US4760248
 US4560862