blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0413792

EP0413792 - PRODUCTS CONTAINING A LITHIUM SALT AND A TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.1993
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.07.1993 [1993/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNOLL AG
Postfach 21 08 05
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/09]For all designated states
KNOLL AG
Postfach 21 08 05
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KEMPENI, Joachim
Altdorfer Strasse 14 a
D-6730 Neustadt-Duttweiler / DE
02 / KLUGE, Michael
Am Huebaum 3
D-6701 Kallstadt / DE
03 / FIERS, Walter
Beukendreef 3
B-9120 Destelbergen / BE
[1991/09]
Representative(s)Karau, Wolfgang, et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/09]Karau, Wolfgang, Dr., et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date90903818.427.02.1990
[1991/09]
WO1990EP00324
Priority number, dateDE1989390724407.03.1989         Original published format: DE 3907244
[1991/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9010455
Date:20.09.1990
Language:DE
[1990/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0413792
Date:27.02.1991
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1991/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0413792
Date:15.07.1992
Language:DE
[1992/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.1990
ClassificationIPC:A61K37/02, A61K33/00
[1991/09]
CPC:
A61K38/191 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP)
C-Set:
A61K38/191, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/191, A61K33/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1991/09]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGNISSE, ENTHALTEND EIN LITHIUMSALZ UND EINEN TUMOR-NEKROSE-FAKTOR[1991/09]
English:PRODUCTS CONTAINING A LITHIUM SALT AND A TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR[1991/09]
French:PRODUITS CONTENANT UN SEL DE LITHIUM ET UN FACTEUR DE NECROSE DE TUMEURS[1991/09]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1990National basic fee paid 
19.10.1990Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1990Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1990Examination requested  [1991/09]
23.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.09.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.1992Fee for grant paid
05.03.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.04.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchWO8703489  [ ] (BIOGEN NV [NL])
    [ ] - Proc. Natl. Acad, Sci. USA, Band 86, Dezember 1989, (Washington, US), R. BEYAERt et al.: "Lithium Chloride Potentiates Tumor Necrosis Factor-Mediated Cytotoxicity in Vitro and in Vivo", seiten 9494-9498
    [ ] - Proceedings of AACR, Band 29, Marz 1988, R. KNOWLES et al.: "Lithium Chloride Stimulates Human Monocytes to Secrete Tumor Necrosis Factor", seite 433, Zusammenfassung 1724,
    [ ] - Cancer, Band 48, Nr. 12, Dezember 1981, American Cancer Society, (Amsterdam, NL), R.S. STEIN et al.: "Lithium Carbonate and Granulocyte Production: Dose Optimization", seiten 2696-2701
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.