Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0463089

EP0463089 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.10.1998
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Utah Research Foundation
210 Park Building
Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/23]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF UTAH RESEARCH FOUNDATION
210 Park Building
Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF UTAH
Technology Transfer Office, 295 Chipeta Way, Suite 280
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PONS, Stanley
2125 South Yuma
Salt Lake City, UT 89019 / US
02 / FLEISCHMANN, Martin
Bury Lodge, Duck Street
Tisbury, Wiltshire SP3 6LJ / GB
[1996/23]
Former [1992/12]01 / PONS, Stanley
2125 South Yuma
Salt Lake City, UT 89019 / US
02 / FLEISCHMANN, Martin
Bury Lodge, Duck Street
Tisbury, Wiltshire SP3 6LJ / GB
03 / WALLING, Cheves, T.
Box 537, Jaffrey
New Hampshire 03452 / US
04 / SIMONS, John, P.
834 16th Avenue
Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US
Former [1992/01]01 / PONS, Stanley
2125 South Yuma
Salt Lake City, UT 89019 / US
02 / FLEISCHMANN, Martin
Bury Lodge, Duck Street
Tisbury, Wiltshire SP3 6LJ / GB
03 / WALLING, Cheves, T.
2784 Blue Spruce Drive
Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US
04 / SIMONS, John, P.
834 16th Avenue
Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US
Representative(s)Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [1992/01]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date90905756.412.03.1990
[1992/01]
WO1990US01328
Priority number, dateUS1989032351313.03.1989         Original published format: US 323513
US1989032669321.03.1989         Original published format: US 326693
US1989033523310.04.1989         Original published format: US 335233
US1989033887914.04.1989         Original published format: US 338879
US1989033964618.04.1989         Original published format: US 339646
US1989034607902.05.1989         Original published format: US 346079
US1989035247816.05.1989         Original published format: US 352478
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9010935
Date:20.09.1990
Language:EN
[1990/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0463089
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0463089
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Search report(s)International search reportEP20.09.1990
ClassificationInternational:G21B1/00
[1992/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIEERZEUGUNG[1992/01]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER GENERATION[1992/01]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE PUISSANCE[1992/01]
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/21: Teilanmeldung 95116753.5 eingereicht am 24/10/95
EPB 1996/21: Divisional application 95116753.5 filed on 24/10/95
EPB 1996/21: Demande divisionnaire 95116753.5 déposée le 24/10/95
Entry into regional phase13.09.1991National basic fee paid 
13.09.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
13.09.1991Examination requested  [1992/01]
02.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
16.08.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.1996Fee for grant paid
23.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95116753.5  / EP0698893
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.02.1997  05.03.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Technologies, Inc.
2074 20th Street Sarasota
Florida 34234 / US
Opponent's representative
Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1997/16]
Opponent(s)01  21.02.1997   
Clean Energy Technologies, Inc.
2074 20th Street
Sarasota Florida 34234 / US
Opponent's representative
Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al
ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
15.05.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.07.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.07.1998Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/50]
Request for further processing for:19.10.1994Request for further processing filed
19.10.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199506   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB12.03.1998
LU12.03.1998
ES13.03.1998
SE13.03.1998
[2004/38]
Former [2000/06]GB12.03.1998
SE13.03.1998
LU31.03.1998
Former [1999/25]GB12.03.1998
SE13.03.1998
Former [1999/02]SE13.03.1998
Cited inInternational search   [ ] Fusion Technology, Vol. 16, No. 2, September 1989, (La Grange Park, IL, US), Y. Oka et al.: "D2O-Fueled Fusion Power Reactor using Electrochemically Induced D-Dn, D-Dp, and Deuterium-Tritium Reactions-Preliminary Design of a Reactor System", pages 263-267
    [ ] Fusion Technology, Vol. 16, No. 2, September 1989, (La Grange Park, IL, US), V.C. ROGERS: "Isotopic Hydrogen Fusion in Metals", pages 254-259
    [ ] Technical Bulletin, Engelhard Industries, Vol. 7, No. 1-2, 1966, Baker Platinum Division, (Sutton, Surrey, GB), H. BRODOWSKY et al.: "Solubility and Diffusion of Hydrogen and Deuterium in Palladium and Palladium Alloys", pages 41-50
Examination   - Paneth and Peters, Berichte der Deutschen Chemischen Gesellschaft, vol. 59 (8), 1926, pp. 2039-2048
    - Var alkemist i Tomegränd - en bok av och om John Tandberg, CWK Gleerup Bokförlag, Lund, Sweden, 1970, pp. 33,34,42,43