Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0466805

EP0466805 - JOINT PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.1994
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.1994 [1994/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB Astra
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1992/48]For all designated states
AB Astra
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1992/47]For all designated states
AB Astra
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
For all designated states
WENNBERG, Stig
Villa Holma P1 16266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
Former [1992/04]For all designated states
ALBREKTSSON, Björn
Sveagat 11
S-413 14 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
WENNBERG, Stig
Villa Holma P1 16266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Albrektsson, Björn
Sveagat 11
S-413 14 Göteborg / SE
02 / Wennberg, Stig
Villa Holma P1 6266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
[1993/27]
Former [1992/47]01 / Albrektsson, Björn
Sveagat 11
S-413 14 Göteborg / SE
02 / Wennberg, Stig
Villa Holma P1 16266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
Former [1992/04]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1993/21]
Former [1992/04]Mossmark, Anders , et al
Albihn West AB, Box 142
S-401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date90906422.203.04.1990
[1992/04]
WO1990SE00215
Priority number, dateSE1989000131511.04.1989         Original published format: SE 8901315
[1992/04]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9011739
Date:18.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0466805
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0466805
Date:07.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.10.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30
[1992/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/04]
TitleGerman:BIEGEGLIEDPROTHESE[1992/04]
English:JOINT PROSTHESIS[1992/04]
French:PROTHESE ARTICULATOIRE[1992/04]
Entry into regional phase23.10.1990Translation filed 
03.10.1991National basic fee paid 
03.10.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB
08.10.1991Examination requested  [1992/04]
26.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.1993Fee for grant paid
11.01.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3008292
 [Y]FR2589353
 [A]DE3205577
 [A]FR2433932