Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0469044
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
30.11.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |
30.09.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] |
23.08.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
18.08.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
12.07.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
14.10.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] |
06.10.1993 |
First examination report |
|
18.12.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
18.12.1991 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |