Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0471701

EP0471701 - NOVEL TNF-INHIBIT PROTEINS AND THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Change - classificationpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
16.03.2007Change - classificationpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2007/10]
Former [1992/09]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEMAIRE, Hans-Georg
Flomersheimer Eck 7
D-6716 Dirmstein / DE
02 / HILLEN, Heinz
Max-Planck-Strasse 17
D-6733 Hassloch / DE
03 / MOELLER, Achim
3 Carriage Lane
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
04 / DAUM, Lothar
Reiherstrasse 25
D-6701 Otterstadt / DE
05 / DOERPER, Thomas
Luitpoldstrasse 3
D-6719 Bissersheim / DE
06 / SUBKOWSKI, Thomas
Ruchheimer Strasse 1
D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE
[1992/09]
Representative(s)Schweiger, Georg
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner
Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]Schweiger, Georg, Dr.
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date90906924.704.05.1990
[1992/09]
WO1990EP00719
Priority number, dateDE1989391507209.05.1989         Original published format: DE 3915072
DE1989392208905.07.1989         Original published format: DE 3922089
[1992/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9013575
Date:15.11.1990
Language:DE
[1990/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0471701
Date:26.02.1992
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990
[1992/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0471701
Date:19.10.1994
Language:DE
[1994/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0471701
Date:07.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.1990
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, A61K35/12
[2007/10]
Former International [1992/09]C07K15/14, A61K35/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/09]
TitleGerman:NEUE PROTEINE MIT TNF-HEMMENDER WIRKUNG UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG[1992/09]
English:NOVEL TNF-INHIBIT PROTEINS AND THEIR PREPARATION[1992/09]
French:NOUVELLES PROTEINES A EFFET D'INHIBITION DE TNF ET LEUR PREPARATION[1992/09]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1991National basic fee paid 
13.09.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
13.09.1991Examination requested  [1992/09]
07.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.1994Fee for grant paid
13.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.1995  27.07.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Inter-Lab Ltd.
Science-Based Industrial Park Kiryat Weizmann
Ness-Ziona 76110 / IL
Opponent's representative
Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer
Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/37]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.1995  27.07.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Inter-Lab Ltd.
Science-Based Industrial Park Kiryat Weizmann
Ness-Ziona 76110 / IL
Opponent's representative
Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, Dr.
Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.02.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.08.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.06.1997Date of oral proceedings
15.10.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.10.1997Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.09.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03)
24.05.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.07.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.07.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.10.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.01.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.12.1997Appeal received No.  T0093/98
25.02.1998Statement of grounds filed
04.12.2001Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.12.2001Date of oral proceedings
17.12.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational searchEP0308378  [ ] (YEDA RES & DEV [IL])