Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0471701 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0471701



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 538
07.02.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.02.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
25.01.2006 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
25.01.2006 French translation of claims Opposition 1
25.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
21.10.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
15.10.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
11.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
14.06.2005 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.06.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.03.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
08.03.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
08.03.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.02.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.06.2004 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
15.06.2004 Description Opposition 1
15.06.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.05.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.04.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.04.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
05.04.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
17.02.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.12.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.09.2002 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
16.09.2002 Description Opposition 4
16.09.2002 Description Opposition 2
16.09.2002 Description Opposition 4
16.09.2002 Description Opposition 2
16.09.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.09.2002 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
05.07.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
16.05.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
14.03.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.03.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.12.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.12.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.12.2001 Claims Appeal 2
04.12.2001 Claims Appeal 2
04.12.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
04.12.2001 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
30.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
28.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 4
27.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.11.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
26.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 7
16.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
16.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.11.2001 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
12.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.11.2001 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
09.11.2001 Claims Appeal 2
09.11.2001 Claims Appeal 2
09.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 4
09.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 8
09.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.05.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.05.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.05.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.05.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
14.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
05.12.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
29.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.12.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
01.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.04.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
30.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
26.08.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.08.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.08.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.08.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
30.07.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
30.07.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.07.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
27.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.03.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.03.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.02.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
25.02.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
02.02.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.02.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.11.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.10.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.10.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
15.10.1997 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.10.1997 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.10.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 15
15.10.1997 Means of redress Opposition 1
15.10.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
22.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.05.1997 Claims Opposition 1
16.05.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.05.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
11.01.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.01.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.12.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
16.12.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.12.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.11.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.11.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
07.11.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.11.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.02.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
12.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.08.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.08.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.07.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
19.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.07.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
08.09.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.08.1994 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
10.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.08.1994 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
13.05.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.05.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
13.05.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
07.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
07.03.1994 Description Search / examination 1
07.03.1994 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.03.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
07.02.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.02.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
16.11.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.10.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.10.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.01.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.09.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
31.05.1991 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
31.05.1991 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
31.05.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.12.1990 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.12.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.1990 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
15.11.1990 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12
15.11.1990 Priority document Search / examination 12
15.11.1990 Priority document Search / examination 14
29.05.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1