blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0474656

EP0474656 - COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.1995 [1995/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELDIX GmbH
Postfach 10 56 08
D-69046 Heidelberg / DE
[1992/12]
Inventor(s)01 / FEIGENBUTZ, Michael
Weidweg 4
D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE
02 / FAULHABER, Michael
Lahrerstrasse 45
D-6800 Mannheim 61 / DE
[1994/15]
Former [1992/12]01 / FEIGENBUTZ, Michael
Weidweg 4
D-6900 Heidelberg / DE
02 / FAULHABER, Michael
Lahrerstrasse 45
D-6800 Mannheim 61 / DE
Representative(s)Wiechmann, Manfred
Robert Bosch GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]Wiechmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Robert Bosch GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1992/12]Wiechmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH, Patentabteilung, Postfach 30 00
D-71520 Backnang / DE
Application number, filing date90907008.811.05.1990
[1992/12]
WO1990EP00758
Priority number, dateDE1989391771531.05.1989         Original published format: DE 3917715
[1992/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9015387
Date:13.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0474656
Date:18.03.1992
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1992/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0474656
Date:13.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.1990
ClassificationIPC:G06F15/16
[1992/12]
CPC:
G06F15/17 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/12]
TitleGerman:RECHNERSYSTEM[1992/12]
English:COMPUTER SYSTEM[1992/12]
French:SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE[1992/12]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1991National basic fee paid 
30.09.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
30.09.1991Examination requested  [1992/12]
16.08.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1993Fee for grant paid
21.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchEP0311705  [ ] (HONEYWELL BULL [US]);
 EP0318270  [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]);
 US4099233  [ ] (BARBAGELATA GIUSEPPE, et al)
    [ ] - IEEE Micro, Band 5, Nr. 4, August 1985, IEEE, (New York, US), J. ROSE et al.: "FERMTOR: A Tunable Multiprocessor Architecture", seiten 5-17
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.