Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0431108

EP0431108 - OXYGENO-PHONATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.03.1998
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUCHON, Jean-Michel
Chaux-la-Lotière
F-70190 Rioz / FR
[1992/49]
Former [1991/24]For all designated states
HUCHON, Jean-Michel
Chaux-la-Lotière
F-70190 Rioz / FR
For all designated states
VANNSON, Phillippe
Chemin du Salon Laverney
F-25170 Recologne / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Huchon, Jean-Michel
Chaux-la-Lotière
F-70190 Rioz / FR
02 / Vannson, Philippe
Chemin du Salon Laverney
F-25170 Recologne / FR
[1992/49]
Former [1991/24]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude
Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073
69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/24]Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude
Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073
F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date90908562.301.06.1990
[1991/24]
WO1990FR00382
Priority number, dateFR1989000762505.06.1989         Original published format: FR 8907625
[1991/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9014854
Date:13.12.1990
Language:FR
[1990/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0431108
Date:12.06.1991
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990
[1991/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0431108
Date:08.12.1993
Language:FR
[1993/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/04, A61M16/20
[1991/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/24]
TitleGerman:SPRECHEINRICHTUNG ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI SAUERSTOFFVERSORGUNG[1991/24]
English:OXYGENO-PHONATION DEVICE[1991/24]
French:DISPOSITIF D'OXYGENO-PHONATION[1991/24]
Entry into regional phase29.12.1990National basic fee paid 
29.12.1990Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.1990Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/24]
14.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1993Fee for grant paid
03.09.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.09.1994  22.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Bror F. Palmcrantz
Box 4406
S- 16515 Hässelby / SE
 [1994/44]
17.10.1994No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
14.12.1994No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
21.12.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.03.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.05.1995Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
19.06.1995Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
21.01.1998Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/17]
21.01.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.12.1995Appeal received No.  T0052/96
27.02.1996Statement of grounds filed
25.02.1997Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1997/09]
22.04.1997Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/17]
21.01.1998Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
21.01.1998Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2000/52]CH08.12.1993
LI08.12.1993
Cited inInternational searchUS3683931  [ ];
 DE8701414U  [ ];
 US4325366  [ ]