Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0431108 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0431108



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 517
01.04.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.03.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.03.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.03.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
28.02.1998 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
27.02.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.01.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.01.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.01.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.01.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
21.01.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
21.01.1998 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
20.01.1998 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
12.01.1998 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
12.01.1998 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
22.12.1997 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
17.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.11.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
15.11.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.11.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.11.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
06.11.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.11.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.10.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.10.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.10.1997 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
26.05.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
29.04.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.04.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.1997 Claims Appeal 1
22.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
22.04.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.02.1997 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
25.02.1997 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
05.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.1997 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 11
25.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.07.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
05.03.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.02.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
31.01.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.01.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
26.01.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.12.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.11.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.11.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.11.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.11.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1995 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
02.11.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
02.11.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
26.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.09.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
04.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.06.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
19.06.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
19.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
14.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
24.05.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.04.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.04.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.04.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
22.03.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
12.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.01.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
21.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.12.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.1994 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.09.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
06.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 102
06.09.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.09.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
28.10.1993 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.09.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.09.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.09.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.06.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 7
19.05.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
19.05.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
19.05.1993 Description Search / examination 2
19.05.1993 Description Search / examination 2
19.05.1993 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.05.1993 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
07.05.1993 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
26.02.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.02.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
17.02.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
09.01.1993 Description Search / examination 3
09.01.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.12.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.10.1992 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.08.1992 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
14.08.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.07.1992 Request for assignment Search / examination 5
03.05.1991 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.01.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
31.01.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
31.01.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
31.01.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.01.1991 Priority document Search / examination 18
15.01.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.12.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
21.12.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
21.12.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Description Search / examination 9
21.12.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Drawings Search / examination 2
21.12.1990 Drawings Search / examination 2
21.12.1990 Drawings Search / examination 2
21.12.1990 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.12.1990 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
13.12.1990 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.12.1990 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
20.08.1990 Priority document Search / examination 8
29.06.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1