Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0477264 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0477264



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 335
28.02.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.02.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.01.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
31.01.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.01.2001 Invitation to file an authorisation Appeal 1
11.01.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.01.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
09.01.2001 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
21.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.12.2000 Claims Appeal 1
19.12.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.12.2000 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
12.12.2000 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
24.10.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.10.2000 Claims Appeal 1
19.10.2000 Claims Appeal 1
19.10.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.10.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
21.07.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.07.2000 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.07.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.07.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.07.2000 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
05.07.2000 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
05.07.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.06.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
07.10.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.09.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.09.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
24.09.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
26.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1999 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
23.03.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.03.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.03.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
27.01.1998 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
22.01.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.01.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.01.1998 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.01.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
21.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
20.11.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.11.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.11.1997 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.11.1997 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
14.11.1997 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
14.11.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
14.11.1997 Means of redress Search / examination 1
14.10.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Search / examination 1
23.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
23.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
22.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
22.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 3
22.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
19.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
19.09.1997 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 3
15.09.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
09.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
08.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.09.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
29.08.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
25.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.08.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 2
14.08.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 27
14.08.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 1
14.08.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 1
05.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.08.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
01.08.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
15.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
02.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
20.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
15.05.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.05.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
05.05.1997 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
05.05.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Search / examination 4
05.05.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Search / examination 1
05.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Search / examination 1
09.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.04.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.01.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
29.11.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 2
25.11.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Search / examination 3
15.07.1996 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.07.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Search / examination 2
26.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
19.06.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Search / examination 5
20.05.1996 General authorisation Search / examination 1
20.05.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.05.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Search / examination 1
15.05.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
04.05.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.05.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.01.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Search / examination 1
17.01.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Search / examination 1
21.12.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Search / examination 1
08.12.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 2
08.12.1995 Notice of opposition Search / examination 4
26.01.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.12.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
05.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
13.09.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.09.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.05.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.05.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
10.05.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
24.12.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
24.12.1993 Description Search / examination 2
24.12.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.12.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.08.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.08.1992 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.08.1992 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.08.1992 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
19.02.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.12.1991 Authorisation Search / examination 1
17.12.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.12.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.12.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
03.12.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
03.12.1991 Description Search / examination 3
03.12.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
08.10.1991 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
08.10.1991 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
08.10.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.03.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.01.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.12.1990 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
27.12.1990 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10
27.12.1990 Priority document Search / examination 12
24.07.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1