Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0489034

EP0489034 - SELECTIVE CALL SIGNALLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.12.1998
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.1999 [1999/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1992/24]
Inventor(s)01 / DELUCA, Michael, Joseph
550 SW 6th Avenue
Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US
02 / SNOWDEN, Gregory, Olon
7200 NW 2 Avenue, 143
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
03 / SCHWENDEMAN, Robert, John
590 SE 10th Avenue
Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US
04 / JASINSKI, Leon
2429 E. Las Olas Blvd.
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US
[1992/24]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property Operations
Midpoint
Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/24]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date90911548.713.07.1990
[1992/24]
WO1990US03876
Priority number, dateUS1989039618921.08.1989         Original published format: US 396189
[1992/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9103037
Date:07.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0489034
Date:10.06.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991
[1992/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0489034
Date:28.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.03.1991
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:G08B5/22
[1992/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/24]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVES SYSTEM FÜR AUFRUFSIGNALE[1992/24]
English:SELECTIVE CALL SIGNALLING SYSTEM[1992/24]
French:SYSTEME SELECTIF DE SIGNALISATION D'APPEL[1992/24]
Entry into regional phase20.03.1992National basic fee paid 
20.03.1992Search fee paid 
20.03.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB
20.03.1992Examination requested  [1992/24]
08.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1997Fee for grant paid
04.11.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199506   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1996
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4427980  ;
 [Y]US4519068  ;
 [Y]US4668949  ;
 [Y]US4688035