Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0446316

EP0446316 - MINIATURE FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.10.2001
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micronel AG
Zürcherstrasse 51
CH-8307 Tagelswangen / CH
[1991/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MEIER, Peter
Im Chrummenacher 62
CH-8315 Lindau / CH
02 / SCHERRER, Ernst
Stationsstrasse 130
CH-8606 Greifensee / CH
[1991/38]
Representative(s)Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1993/28]Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
CH-8023 Zürich / CH
Former [1991/38]Groner, Manfred
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
CH-8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date90913243.320.09.1990
[1991/38]
WO1990CH00223
Priority number, dateCH1989000354029.09.1989         Original published format: CH 354089
[1991/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9105169
Date:18.04.1991
Language:DE
[1991/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0446316
Date:18.09.1991
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991
[1991/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0446316
Date:02.02.1994
Language:DE
[1994/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0446316
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.1991
ClassificationInternational:F04D25/06, F04D29/32
[1991/38]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1991/38]
TitleGerman:KLEINVENTILATOR[1991/38]
English:MINIATURE FAN[1991/38]
French:PETIT VENTILATEUR[1991/38]
Entry into regional phase22.05.1991National basic fee paid 
22.05.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.1991Examination requested  [1991/38]
29.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1993Fee for grant paid
14.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.10.1994  21.11.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Papst-Motoren GmbH & Co. KG
Marl-Maier-Strasse 1
D-78112 St Georgen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Postfach 13 01 13
42028 Wuppertal / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1994/52]
Opponent(s)01  31.10.1994  21.11.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Papst-Motoren GmbH & Co. KG
Marl-Maier-Strasse 1
D-78112 St Georgen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Postfach 13 01 13
D-42028 Wuppertal / DE
09.11.1994No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
16.11.1994No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
13.12.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.04.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.07.1997Date of oral proceedings
29.07.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.07.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.03.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.04.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.08.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.09.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition16.09.1997Appeal received No.  T0986/97
02.12.1997Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2000Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
25.02.2000Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK02.02.1994
FR02.02.1994
GB02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
[2006/32]
Former [2003/01]DK02.02.1994
GB02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
Former [1999/42]DK02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
Former [1998/15]DK02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
Former [1994/45]SE02.02.1994
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4504751  (MEIER PETER [CH]);
 [Y]DE2944183  (PAPST MOTOREN KG);
 [Y]EP0180176  (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [Y]FR1177794  ;
 [A]DE1503483  (ELECTROLUX AB)