Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0446316 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0446316



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 482
25.10.2001 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.10.2001 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.10.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
28.09.2001 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
02.08.2001 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
02.08.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
02.08.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
27.07.2001 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
22.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.04.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.04.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.04.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
12.04.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
12.04.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
12.04.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
12.04.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.04.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.04.2001 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
07.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.02.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
09.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.12.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.12.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.12.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.04.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.04.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.02.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.02.2000 Claims Appeal 1
25.02.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
25.02.2000 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
24.02.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.02.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
24.01.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
17.12.1999 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
01.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.12.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.11.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.11.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
25.11.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.11.1999 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.11.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
08.11.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
16.06.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.06.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.04.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
09.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.12.1997 Non-scannable object Appeal 4
11.12.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
04.12.1997 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
04.12.1997 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
04.12.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
02.12.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
28.11.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.10.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.10.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.09.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.09.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.08.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.07.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
29.07.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
29.07.1997 Claims Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Claims Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
29.07.1997 Means of redress Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
29.07.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
07.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.06.1997 Claims Opposition 1
11.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.05.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.05.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.05.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
05.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
05.05.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
28.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
23.04.1997 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
22.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.04.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.04.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.04.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.03.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.08.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.08.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.08.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
27.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.06.1996 Claims Opposition 1
21.06.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
24.04.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.12.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
18.12.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.12.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
15.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.04.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.04.1995 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
15.04.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.04.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
15.04.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 9
15.04.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 46
15.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
13.12.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.12.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.11.1994 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
19.11.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.11.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.11.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.11.1994 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 2
09.11.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.10.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
23.12.1993 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.10.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.10.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
14.10.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
03.08.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.07.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.04.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.04.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
06.04.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.03.1993 Description Search / examination 2
04.03.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.1993 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.02.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
30.01.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.04.1992 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.08.1991 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.06.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.05.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
22.05.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.05.1991 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.05.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
18.04.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
18.04.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12
18.04.1991 Priority document Search / examination 14
28.09.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1