Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0441953

EP0441953 - NEW CORES FOR TECHNETIUM RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amersham plc
Amersham Place Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Amersham plc
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
Nycomed Amersham plc
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Former [1991/34]For all designated states
AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ARCHER, Colin Mill
Amersham International plc, Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
02 / DILWORTH, Jonathan Robin, Dept. of Chemistryand
Biol.Chemistry, University of Essex, Wivenhoe Park
Colchester, Essex C04 3SQ / GB
03 / JOBANPUTRA, Panna
27 Sinnington End, Highwoods
Colchester, Essex C04 4RE / GB
04 / LATHAM, Ian Andrew
Amersham International plc, Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
05 / THOMPSON, Russell Martin, Dept. of Chemistry and
Biol.Chemistry, University of Essex, Wivenhoe Park
Colchester, Essex C04 3SQ / GB
[1991/34]
Representative(s)Gaunt, Robert John , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/34]Gaunt, Robert John , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street
London EC4Y 1LL / GB
Application number, filing date90914225.928.08.1990
[1991/34]
WO1990GB01330
Priority number, dateGB1989001948829.08.1989         Original published format: GB 8919488
[1991/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9103262
Date:21.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0441953
Date:21.08.1991
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991
[1991/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0441953
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/00, C07B59/00
[1995/49]
Former International [1991/34]A61K49/02, C07B59/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/34]
TitleGerman:KERNE FÜR TECHNETIUM-RADIOARZNEIMITTEL[1991/34]
English:NEW CORES FOR TECHNETIUM RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS[1991/34]
French:NOUVEAUX NOYAUX POUR PRODUITS RADIOPHARMACEUTIQUES AU TECHNETIUM[1991/34]
Entry into regional phase08.04.1991National basic fee paid 
08.04.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1991Examination requested  [1991/34]
07.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.1995Fee for grant paid
30.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.1996  13.09.1996  ADMISSIBLE
The Du Pont Merck Pharmaceutical Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.1996  13.09.1996  ADMISSIBLE
The Du Pont Merck Pharmaceutical Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1996/44]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.1996   
The Du Pont Merck Pharmaceutical Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler, Alek
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
09.10.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.02.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.03.1998Date of oral proceedings
16.04.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.04.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.04.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.05.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/30]
Appeal following opposition06.06.1998Appeal received No.  T0590/98
26.08.1998Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M00) [2002/13]
30.04.2003Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
30.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
06.08.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.1995
CH06.12.1995
IT06.12.1995
LI06.12.1995
NL06.12.1995
SE06.03.1996
LU31.08.1996
[2003/07]
Former [2000/06]AT06.12.1995
CH06.12.1995
IT06.12.1995
LI06.12.1995
SE06.03.1996
LU31.08.1996
Former [1999/42]AT06.12.1995
CH06.12.1995
IT06.12.1995
LI06.12.1995
SE06.03.1996
Former [1997/28]AT06.12.1995
CH06.12.1995
LI06.12.1995
SE06.03.1996
Former [1996/42]AT06.12.1995
SE06.03.1996
Former [1996/32]SE06.03.1996
Cited inInternational search[XP]  - Polyhedron, volume 9, no. 12, June 1990, Pergamon Press Plc., (Oxford, GB), A.M. Archer et al.: "Development of new technetium cores containing technetium-nitrogen multiple bonds. Synthesis and characterization of some diazenido-. hydrazido- and imido- complexes of technetium", pages 1497-1502
 [Y]  - Nouveau Journal de Chimie, volume 1, no. 6, (Montreux, FR), D.L. DuBois et al.: "Diazenido, dinitrogen and related complexes", pages 479-492
 [XP]  - Inorg. Chem., volume 28, 4 October 1989, American Chemical Society, (Washington, DC, US), T. Nicholson et al.: "Synthesis, spectroscopy, and structural characterization of five-coordinate, Bis (aryldiazenido)technetium complexes and their protonation reactions. X-ray structure of TxCI(PPh3)2(NNC6H4BR)2" pages 3813-3819
 [Y]  - J. Chem. Soc. Chem. Commun., 1970, (London, GB), I.S. Kolomnikov et al.: "Phenyl isocyanate as a source of phenylimido-ligand", page 1432
 [Y]  - Journal of Radioanalytical and Nuclear Chemistry, Articles, Volume 102, no. 2, 1986, Elsevier Sequoia S.A., (Lausanne, CH), S. Abram et al.: "Lipophilic technetium complexes. IV neutral. lipid-soluble technetium complexes with dithioligands containing T0=O and Tc=N cores an in vitro study", pages 309-320
Examination   - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 28, 04 October 1989, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC (US); T. NICHOLSON et al., pp. 3813-3819
    - JOURNAL OF RADIOANALYTICAL & NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, Articles, volume 102, no. 2, 1986, Elsevier Sequoia S.A., Lausanne (CH); S. ABRAM et al., pp. 309-320