Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0441953 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0441953



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1251
03.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
18.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
12.01.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.06.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
20.05.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 49
24.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
17.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
02.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
27.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
22.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 25
12.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 24
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.11.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
04.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
04.11.2002 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Non-scannable object Appeal 12
01.11.2002 Board of Appeal mail Appeal 120
24.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 30
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.09.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.09.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 9
13.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 117
06.08.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
30.07.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.07.2002 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
30.07.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
24.07.2002 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
10.07.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
05.07.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.07.2002 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.07.2002 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
01.07.2002 Annex Appeal 3
01.07.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 1
01.07.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 1
01.07.2002 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2002 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2002 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2002 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 11
01.07.2002 Request for change of name Appeal 1
01.07.2002 Request for change of name Appeal 1
28.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 25
28.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 3
27.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 4
27.03.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.03.2002 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
13.03.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.03.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.03.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.03.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.04.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.03.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Appeal 1
15.03.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.03.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.03.1999 Claims Appeal 4
02.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
14.12.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.12.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.12.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
04.09.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.08.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.08.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.08.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.08.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.08.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
25.06.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.06.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.06.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
06.06.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
16.04.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
16.04.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1998 Text intended for grant Opposition 46
03.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.02.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1998 Claims Opposition 2
08.01.1998 Claims Opposition 2
08.01.1998 Claims Opposition 2
08.01.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.01.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
23.12.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.11.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.11.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
11.11.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
11.11.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.10.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.02.1997 Claims Opposition 2
12.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.02.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
10.02.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
09.10.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.10.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.09.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.09.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
26.10.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.07.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.07.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.07.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.04.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
27.03.1995 Description Search / examination 1
27.03.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.03.1995 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
10.03.1995 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
03.03.1995 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
31.10.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
31.10.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
30.09.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.03.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
14.03.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.01.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.07.1991 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.05.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.1991 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.1991 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.04.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.04.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
21.03.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.03.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 62
21.03.1991 Priority document Search / examination 44
14.03.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
11.03.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
14.01.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
12.10.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
28.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1