Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0636244

EP0636244 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING AGENT GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/05]METHOD FOR ANALYZING AGENT GAS
[1997/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.1998
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NELLCOR INCORPORATED
4280 Hacienda Drive
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
[1997/13]
Former [1995/05]For all designated states
NELLCOR INCORPORATED
25495 Whitesell Street
Hayward California 94545 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FLEWELLING, Ross, F.
15 Orinda Vista Drive
Oakland, CA 94605 / US
02 / JOHANSSON, Eric, T.
6922 Pine Court
Dublin, CA 94568 / US
03 / FERUS, Lucille, A.
3853 Collidge Avenue
Oakland, CA 94602 / US
04 / CULVER, John, A.
634 Broderick
San Francisco, CA 94117 / US
05 / BRETON, Keith, H.
108 Laredo Court
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[1995/05]
Representative(s)Wilson, Nicholas Martin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/05]Wilson, Nicholas Martin , et al
WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date90914566.606.09.1990
[1995/05]
WO1990US05046
Priority number, dateUS1989040623011.09.1989         Original published format: US 406230
[1995/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9103727
Date:21.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0636244
Date:01.02.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991
[1995/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0636244
Date:28.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.1991
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/35
[1995/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/23]
Former [1995/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:REAGENZGASANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[1995/05]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING AGENT GAS[1997/22]
French:ANALYSEUR DE GAZ ANESTHESIANTS ET MODE D'EMPLOI[1995/05]
Former [1995/05]METHOD FOR ANALYZING AGENT GAS
Entry into regional phase02.03.1992National basic fee paid 
02.03.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [1995/05]
02.03.1992Examination requested  [1995/05]
12.06.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/05]
02.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.11.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.1997Fee for grant paid
26.02.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination17.12.1992Appeal received No.  J0004/93
13.02.1993Statement of grounds filed
09.06.1994Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
01.12.1993Date of oral proceedings
Opposition(s)03.03.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21]
Request for re-establishment of rights:27.02.1992Date of receipt
23.12.1994Request accepted
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9004164  ;
 [A]US4692621  ;
 [A]US4817013