Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0495836 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0495836



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 769
22.09.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
22.09.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
10.08.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.08.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.08.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.07.2000 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.07.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
03.07.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
30.06.2000 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 7
23.06.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
23.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
07.04.2000 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
07.04.2000 Text intended for grant Opposition 27
31.03.2000 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
29.03.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.03.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.03.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.02.2000 Claims Appeal 3
09.02.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
09.02.2000 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
07.02.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.02.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.02.2000 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
07.02.2000 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
04.02.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.01.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.01.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.01.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.01.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.08.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.08.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.08.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.08.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
19.08.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
19.08.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.08.1999 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.07.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.07.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.07.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.01.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.01.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.01.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.1997 Claims Appeal 3
11.02.1997 Claims Appeal 3
11.02.1997 Claims Appeal 3
11.02.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
13.01.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.12.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.12.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.12.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.12.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
28.11.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.11.1996 Authorisation Search / examination 2
21.11.1996 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.11.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.10.1996 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
18.10.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.10.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.10.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.10.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
13.06.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
15.05.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
03.04.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.04.1996 Refund of fees Appeal 1
28.03.1996 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
21.03.1996 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
21.03.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.03.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.02.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.01.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.01.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.01.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.01.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
23.01.1996 Claims Opposition 4
23.01.1996 Claims Opposition 4
23.01.1996 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
23.01.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Means of redress Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
23.01.1996 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 28
17.01.1996 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 2
10.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.11.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
08.11.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.11.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Claims Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Claims Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Claims Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Claims Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Description Opposition 24
08.11.1995 Description Opposition 24
08.11.1995 Description Opposition 24
08.11.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
30.10.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
27.09.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.09.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.04.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
12.04.1995 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.04.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
12.04.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
12.04.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
20.03.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
05.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.07.1994 Claims Opposition 5
27.07.1994 Description Opposition 24
27.07.1994 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
20.05.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.05.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.05.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.01.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.12.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
17.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
17.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
15.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.02.1993 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
13.11.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.09.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
11.09.1992 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.08.1992 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.08.1992 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
24.08.1992 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.06.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.06.1992 Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority Search / examination 1
09.03.1992 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.1992 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.1992 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.1992 Claims Search / examination 5
19.02.1992 Description Search / examination 23
19.02.1992 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
11.02.1992 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 28
11.02.1992 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
11.02.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.06.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.05.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.05.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.05.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
02.05.1991 Priority document Search / examination 32
08.11.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1