Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0450040

EP0450040 - PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC DEPIGMENTATION COMPOSITIONS WITH A CAFFEIC ACID BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1991/41]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
F-75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHARPIN, Isabelle
44, avenue François-Adam
F-94100 S.-Maur-des-Fossés / FR
02 / CANDAU, Didier
5, allée Nicolas-de-Stael
F-77000 Melun / FR
03 / N'GUYEN QUANG, Lan
45, avenue Alsace-Lorraine
F-92160 Antony / FR
04 / MONTASTIER, Christiane
10, rue Marguerite
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
05 / MILLECAMPS, François
11, square A.-Renoir
F-75014 Paris / FR
[1992/04]
Former [1991/41]01 / CHARPIN, Isabelle
44, avenue François-Adam
F-94100 S.-Maur-des-Fossés / FR
02 / CANDAU, Didier
5, allée Nicolas-de-Sta[l
F-77000 Melun / FR
03 / N'GUYEN QUANG, Lan
45, avenue Alsace-Lorraine
F-92160 Antony / FR
04 / MONTASTIER, Christiane
10, rue Marguerite
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
05 / MILLECAMPS, François
11, square A.-Renoir
F-75014 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard , et al
NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/41]Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard , et al
Cabinet Nony 29, rue Cambacérès
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date90916095.419.10.1990
[1991/41]
WO1990FR00760
Priority number, dateFR1989001377420.10.1989         Original published format: FR 8913774
[1991/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9105543
Date:02.05.1991
Language:FR
[1991/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0450040
Date:09.10.1991
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991
[1991/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0450040
Date:09.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48, A61K31/19, A61K31/22, A61K31/165
[1991/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   NL [1991/41]
TitleGerman:DEPIGMENTIERENDES PHARMAZEUTISCHES ODER KOSMETISCHES MITTEL MIT KAFFEINSÄURE[1991/41]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC DEPIGMENTATION COMPOSITIONS WITH A CAFFEIC ACID BASE[1991/41]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET COSMETIQUES DEPIGMENTANTES A BASE D'ACIDE CAFEIQUE[1991/41]
Entry into regional phase17.06.1991National basic fee paid 
17.06.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1991Examination requested  [1992/04]
03.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2000Fee for grant paid
22.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.05.1994Appeal received No.  T0733/94
26.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
16.05.1997Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1997/20]
12.09.1997Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/37]
26.03.1998Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1998/13]
27.07.1998Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1998/31]
23.03.1999Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
17.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2001
NL09.05.2001
[2003/07]
Former [2002/14]AT09.05.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1533371
 [Y]FR2613622
 [A]FR2390160
 [ ]JPS62120312
 [ ]JPS56161315
 [ ]JPH02255607
    [ ] Patent Abstracts of Japan, volume 11, no. 349 (C-456)(2796), 14 novembre 1987; & JP-A-62120312 (POLA CHEM IND. INC.) 1 juin 1987
    [ ] Patent Abstracts of Japan, volume 6, no. 44 (C-95)(922), 19 mars 1982; & JP-A-56161315 (ICHIMARU BOUEKI K.K.) 11 décembre 1981
    [ ] Patent Abstracts of Japan, volume 15, no. 1, 7 janvier 1991, & JP, A, 2255607 (PIAS ARISE KK) 16 octobre 1990, voir le résumé