Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0452509 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0452509



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 450
15.05.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
15.05.2002 Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification Opposition 1
26.01.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.01.2002 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
27.07.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.07.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.07.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
20.06.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.06.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.06.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
12.06.2001 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
16.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
01.03.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.02.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
11.04.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
03.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.08.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.08.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.1998 Description Appeal 1
10.01.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
26.08.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
31.07.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.07.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
27.06.1997 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
26.06.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.06.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.06.1997 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
23.05.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.03.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
24.03.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
24.03.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
24.03.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Means of redress Opposition 1
24.03.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
24.03.1997 Text intended for grant Opposition 12
04.03.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
15.01.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.01.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.08.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.08.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.08.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
13.08.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.08.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.08.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
24.07.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.06.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
11.10.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.09.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.04.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.04.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.04.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.04.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.04.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
27.05.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.04.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.04.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.04.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.02.1994 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
11.01.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
04.01.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.10.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
03.09.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
03.09.1993 Description Search / examination 12
03.09.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.07.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.05.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.03.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
20.03.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.01.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.01.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.01.1993 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.04.1992 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.02.1992 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.02.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.02.1992 European search report Search / examination 5
08.01.1992 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
27.06.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.06.1991 Authorisation Search / examination 1
13.06.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
13.06.1991 Description Search / examination 20
13.06.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.1991 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
30.05.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
30.05.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
30.05.1991 Priority document Search / examination 23
30.11.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1