Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0631836 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0631836



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 196
13.08.1997 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.08.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.05.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.05.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.03.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
09.03.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.02.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
21.02.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
26.01.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
03.12.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
03.12.1995 Description Search / examination 1
03.12.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.10.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.06.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.01.1995 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.01.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
28.12.1994 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.12.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.12.1994 European search report Search / examination 4
01.12.1994 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.11.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.04.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.04.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
09.02.1993 Extension of time limit: YES Appeal 2
02.11.1992 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
04.08.1992 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
22.07.1992 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Appeal 1
04.07.1992 Request for change of name of the applicant Appeal 1
26.06.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
14.05.1992 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
04.05.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.03.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.03.1992 Application refused (formal requirement not fulfilled) Search / examination 4
16.12.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.12.1991 Translation of priority document Search / examination 13
02.12.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.12.1991 Annex Search / examination 2
02.12.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
02.12.1991 Description Search / examination 9
02.12.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
02.12.1991 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
28.11.1991 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.11.1991 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 20
16.10.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.10.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.10.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
11.10.1991 Description Search / examination 9
11.10.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
11.10.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
08.10.1991 Authorisation Search / examination 1
08.10.1991 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.1991 Application deemed to be withdrawn ((part of) translation not filed) Search / examination 1
30.08.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
10.07.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.06.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10
13.06.1991 Priority document Search / examination 16
24.12.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1