Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0439182

EP0439182 - Improved method of amplifying target nucleic acids applicable to both polymerase and ligase chain reactions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.1997
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/51]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Former [1991/31]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
BIOTECHNICA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
85 Bolton Street
Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Backman, Keith C.
200 Carslisle Road
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / Carrino, John J.
4774 Constitution
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
03 / Bond, Sheila B.
96 Little Melody Lane
Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US
04 / Laffler, Thomas G.
1964 Pinehurst Court
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
[1996/17]
Former [1991/31]01 / Backman, Keith C.
200 Carslisle Road
Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US
02 / Carrino, John J.
4774 Constitution
Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US
03 / Bond, Sheila B.
96 Little Melody Lane
Lake Forest Illinois 60045 / US
04 / Laffler, Thomas G.
1964 Pinehurst Court
Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1991/31]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date91100959.525.01.1991
[1991/31]
Priority number, dateUS1990047067426.01.1990         Original published format: US 470674
US1991063477109.01.1991         Original published format: US 634771
[1991/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0439182
Date:31.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0439182
Date:16.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0439182
Date:24.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04, C12Q1/34
[1991/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/31]
TitleGerman:Verbessertes Verfahren zur Amplifikation von Nuklein säurezielsequenz, einsetzbar für die Polymerase und Ligasekettenreaktion[1991/31]
English:Improved method of amplifying target nucleic acids applicable to both polymerase and ligase chain reactions[1991/31]
French:Procédé amélioré pour amplifier d'acides nucléiques cibles applicable à la réaction en chaîne de polymérase et ligase[1991/31]
Examination procedure02.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/10]
02.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.1995Fee for grant paid
18.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16]
Request for further processing for:19.06.1995Request for further processing filed
19.06.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.07.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK24.04.1996
GR24.04.1996
SE24.07.1996
[2000/04]
Former [1998/15]DK24.04.1996
SE24.07.1996
Former [1996/47]SE24.07.1996
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0336731  ;
 [Y]EP0246864  ;
 [A]WO8912696  ;
 [A]US4851331  ;
 [A]WO8910415  ;
 [YD]EP0201184  ;
 [XP]WO9001069  ;
 [YP]EP0357336  ;
 [YP]WO9012115
 [AD]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 86, November 1989, pages 8877-8881; K.G. AU et al.: "Escherichia coli mutY gene encodes an adenine glycosylase active on G-A mispairs"