blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0447760

EP0447760 - Process for preparing drinks out of concentrated fruit juices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eckes-Granini GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Ludwig-Eckes-Allee 6
D-55268 Nieder-Olm / DE
[1995/37]
Former [1991/39]For all designated states
Deutsche Granini GmbH & Co. KG.
Kammerratsheide 31a
D-33609 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Günter, Dr.
Friedenauer Strasse 35
W-4933 Blomberg / DE
02 / Geiss, Helmut
Hindemithweg 10
W-4815 Schloss Holte
Stukenbrock / DE
03 / Horn, Hans-Peter
Katenstrasse 6
W-4937 Lage
Hörste (Lippe) / DE
[1991/39]
Representative(s)Lederer, Franz, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Lederer, Franz, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [1995/35]Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1991/39]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing.
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
D-33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date91101009.826.01.1991
[1991/39]
Priority number, dateDE1990400884520.03.1990         Original published format: DE 4008845
[1991/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0447760
Date:25.09.1991
Language:DE
[1991/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0447760
Date:25.05.1994
Language:DE
[1994/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1991
ClassificationIPC:A23L2/28
[1991/39]
CPC:
A23L2/42 (EP); A23L2/64 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Aufbereiten von aus Fruchtkonzentrat o.dgl. hergestellten Getränken[1991/39]
English:Process for preparing drinks out of concentrated fruit juices[1991/39]
French:Procédé de préparation de boissons à partir de jus concentrés de fruits[1991/39]
Examination procedure31.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/14]
06.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
03.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.11.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.1994Fee for grant paid
15.02.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.1995  08.03.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval AB
Landerigränden
S-22186 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Ruschke, Hans Edvard
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/16]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.1995  08.03.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval AB
Landerigränden
S-22186 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2
D-81679 München / DE
30.03.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.10.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.04.1998Date of oral proceedings
28.05.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.05.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.01.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/15]
13.01.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.07.1998Appeal received No.  T0732/98
13.01.2003Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
13.01.2003Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR31.07.1996
GB26.01.1997
ES27.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
CH31.01.1999
LI31.01.1999
AT26.01.2001
[2004/37]
Former [2002/25]GR31.07.1996
GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
CH31.01.1999
LI31.01.1999
ES16.04.1999
AT26.01.2001
Former [2002/14]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
CH31.01.1999
LI31.01.1999
ES16.04.1999
AT26.01.2001
Former [2000/52]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
CH31.01.1999
LI31.01.1999
ES16.04.1999
Former [2000/50]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
ES16.04.1999
CH21.08.1999
LI21.08.1999
Former [2000/10]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
ES16.04.1999
Former [1998/19]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
FR30.09.1997
Former [1998/11]GB26.01.1997
SE27.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
Former [1998/10]GB26.01.1997
BE31.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
Former [1998/05]GB26.01.1997
NL01.08.1997
Former [1998/03]NL01.08.1997
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0095202  (TETRA PAK INT [SE]);
 [Y]EP0098389  (WIELAND D FULLPACK [DE]);
 [X]EP0136793  (SQUIRT & CO [US])
Examination   - Handbuch der Lebensmitteltechnologie, Frucht- und Gemüsesäfte, Ulrich Schobinger, Verlag Ulmer, Stuttgart, 1987.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.