Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0447760 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0447760



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 357
06.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
17.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.01.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.01.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.01.2003 Claims Appeal 2
13.01.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 27
13.01.2003 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.11.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.10.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.10.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.10.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
16.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.02.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.10.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.10.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.10.1998 Non-scannable object Appeal 9
06.10.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
31.07.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.07.1998 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
29.07.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.07.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.07.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.05.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.05.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.05.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.05.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
28.05.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
28.05.1998 Claims Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Claims Opposition 2
28.05.1998 Description Opposition 2
28.05.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
28.05.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.07.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
08.07.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.07.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
26.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.06.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
18.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.03.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
13.01.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.01.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.12.1996 Claims Opposition 2
12.12.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
06.09.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
30.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.07.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.07.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
27.03.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
27.03.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
18.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.10.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
28.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.07.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
26.07.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.07.1995 Annex Opposition 1
18.07.1995 Authorisation Opposition 1
18.07.1995 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
18.07.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
18.07.1995 Request for assignment Opposition 2
18.07.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.07.1995 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
30.03.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.03.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.03.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
23.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.02.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.02.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.04.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.02.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.02.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.02.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.11.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
16.11.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.10.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.10.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
29.09.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
04.06.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
04.06.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.06.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.05.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.11.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.07.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.07.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
14.03.1991 Authorisation Search / examination 1
14.03.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.03.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.02.1991 Authorisation Search / examination 1
21.02.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.02.1991 Priority document Search / examination 11
21.02.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.02.1991 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
19.02.1991 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
26.01.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.01.1991 Claims Search / examination 2
26.01.1991 Description Search / examination 5
26.01.1991 Drawings Search / examination 2
26.01.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6