Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0441340

EP0441340 - Method for preparing packaged sterilized mineral water and packaged sterilized mineral water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/33]Method for preparing packaged sterilized mineral water, method for producing sterilized container for packaging the same and packaged sterilized mineral water
[1996/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.1997
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.1997 [1997/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
House Food Industrial Co., Ltd.
No. 5-7, 1-chome, Sakae-machi Mikuriya Higashiosaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/33]For all designated states
House Food Industrial Co., Ltd.
No. 5-7, 1-chome, Sakae-machi Mikuriya
Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiguchi, Kazuya
4-12,Shikanodaikita 2-chome
Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP
02 / Taguchi, Masao
Famiru-Hirano 1005, 1-11-23, Hiranominami
Hirano-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
03 / Nakatani, Masayuki
57-204, Heijyo Dai-2 Danchi, 2-2, Ukyo
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
04 / Seki, Tomoyuki
4-4-22, Hara-machi
Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
05 / Shimizu, Takaaki
Amiti-Saidaiji 304, 2-1-1, Saidaiji-Ryuo-cho
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
06 / Orii, Mahito
Amiti-Saidaiji 101, 2-1-1, Saidaiji-Ryuo-cho
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
[1991/33]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/33]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date91101600.406.02.1991
[1991/33]
Priority number, dateJP1990002785607.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2785690
JP1990002785707.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2785790
JP1990002785807.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2785890
JP1990004507226.02.1990         Original published format: JP 4507290
[1991/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0441340
Date:14.08.1991
Language:EN
[1991/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0441340
Date:27.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0441340
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.1991
ClassificationInternational:B65B55/12, A61L2/02
[1996/35]
Former International [1991/48]B65B55/12, A61L2/02, B65B55/10
Former International [1991/33]B65B55/12, A61L2/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/33]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, um das Verpacken von sterilisiertem Mineralwasser vorzubereiten sowie verpacktes, sterilisiertes Mineralwasser[1996/35]
English:Method for preparing packaged sterilized mineral water and packaged sterilized mineral water[1996/35]
French:Procédé pour préparer l'emballage d'eau minérale stérilisée ainsi que l'eau minérale stérilisée et emballée[1996/35]
Former [1991/33]Verfahren, um das Verpacken von sterilisiertem Mineralwasser vorzubereiten, Verfahren zum Erreichen eines sterilisierten Behälters, um dieses Wasser zu verschliessen sowie verpacktes, sterilisiertes Mineralwasser
Former [1991/33]Method for preparing packaged sterilized mineral water, method for producing sterilized container for packaging the same and packaged sterilized mineral water
Former [1991/33]Procédé pour préparer l'emballage d'eau minérale stérilisée, procédé pour obtenir un récipient stérilisé pour emballer ladite eau, ainsi que l'eau minérale stérilisée et emballée
Examination procedure19.05.1992Examination requested  [1992/29]
04.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
26.02.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.1996Fee for grant paid
17.05.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.05.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:SearchGB1000248  [ ] (ROBERT CARL CRISAFI);
 EP0152051  [ ] (MILLIPORE CORP [US]);
 JPS60197288  [ ] (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al);
 EP0086028  [ ] (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]);
 FR2473313  [ ] (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]);
 FR2422569  [ ] (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]);
 [X]US2067838  (GIRTON PAUL K);
 [Y]FR704865  (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG);
 [X]EP0303135  (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE], et al);
 [X]FR1558673  ;
 [XP]EP0381841  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])